Guzman-Loera v. United States of America
Petitioner: JOAQUIN ARCHIVALDO GUZMAN-LOERA
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 24-2160
Filed: August 16, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION, to file a successive application, on behalf of Petitioner Joaquin Archivaldo Guzman-Loera, FILED. Service date 09/25/2024 by United States Mail. [Entered: 10/10/2024 10:18 AM]
September 18, 2024 Filing 10 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment Notice of Appearance Form, at docket entry 9, on behalf of Petitioner Joaquin Archivaldo Guzman-Loera, copy to pro se petitioner, FILED. [Entered: 09/18/2024 01:05 PM]
September 16, 2024 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Petitioner Joaquin Archivaldo Guzman-Loera, FILED. Service date 09/11/2024 by No Service. [Entered: 09/18/2024 10:50 AM]
September 16, 2024 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent United States of America, FILED. Service date 08/10/2024 by ACMS. [Entered: 09/16/2024 06:59 AM]
September 9, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY, Amy Busa for Respondent United States of America, TERMINATED. [Entered: 09/09/2024 12:36 PM]
September 9, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY, Hiral Deepak Mehta in place of attorney Amy Busa, SUBSTITUTED. [Entered: 09/09/2024 12:34 PM]
September 9, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL/ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of United States of America, FILED. [Entered: 09/09/2024 11:38 AM]
August 16, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED. [Entered: 08/16/2024 03:04 PM]
August 16, 2024 Filing 3 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT. [Entered: 08/16/2024 02:56 PM]
August 16, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION, for Second or Successive habeas petition, on behalf of Petitioner Joaquin Archivaldo Guzman-Loera, OPENED. Notice to Petitioner Joaquin Archivaldo Guzman-Loera, requiring filing of application form for second or successive petition, SENT. [Entered: 08/16/2024 02:47 PM]
August 16, 2024 Filing 1 ORIGINAL PROCEEDING, SECOND OR SUCCESSIVE APPLICATION FOR HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF, transferred from U.S. District Court, on behalf of Petitioner Joaquin Archivaldo Guzman Loera, FILED. [Entered: 08/16/2024 02:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Guzman-Loera v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOAQUIN ARCHIVALDO GUZMAN-LOERA
Represented By: Joaquin Archivaldo Guzman-Loera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Amy Busa
Represented By: Hiral Deepak Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?