Delaware Coalition for Open Go v. Leo Strine, Jr., et al Featured Case

Defendant: DELAWARE COURT OF CHANCERY and STATE OF DELAWARE
Plaintiff - Appellee: DELAWARE COALITION FOR OPEN GOVERNMENT
Defendant - Appellant: HON LEO E. STRINE, JR., HON JOHN W. NOBLE, HON DONALD F. PARSONS, JR., Esq., SAM GLASSCOCK, III and HON. J. TRAVIS LASTER
Case Number: 12-3859
Filed: October 11, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 23, 2013 Summary Delaware Coal. for Open Gov't v. Strine

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2014 NOTICE from U.S. Supreme Court. Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed by Leo E. Strine, Jr. on 01/21/2014 and placed on the docket 01/23/2014. Supreme Court Case No. 13-869. (CND)
November 14, 2013 Filing 55 MANDATE ISSUED, filed. (TYW)
October 23, 2013 Filing 54 JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellants. (TYW)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: SLOVITER, FUENTES and ROTH, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 37. Judge: SLOVITER Authoring, Judge: FUENTES Concurring, Judge: ROTH Dissenting. (TYW)
May 16, 2013 ARGUED on Thursday, May 16, 2013. Panel: SLOVITER, FUENTES and ROTH, Circuit Judges. David L. Finger arguing for Appellee Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc; Andrew J. Pincus arguing for Appellant Sam Glasscock III, Appellants J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr. (CMH)
May 1, 2013 Filing 51 Oral Argument Notification for Thursday, 05/16/2013. (CMH)
March 5, 2013 Filing 50 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Andrew J. Pincus, Esq. for Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq., Leo E. Strine, Jr., John W. Noble and J. Travis Laster. Certificate of Service dated 03/05/2013. (AJP)
March 5, 2013 Filing 49 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney David L. Finger, Esq. for Appellee Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc. Certificate of Service dated 03/05/2013. (DLF)
February 27, 2013 Filing 48 Calendared for Thursday, 05/16/13. (Rescheduled from Thursday, 05/09/2013)--[Edited 05/01/2013 by CMH] (CMH)
February 11, 2013 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. - Reply Brief. Copies: 10. (KEL)
February 8, 2013 Filing 46 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. Certificate of Service dated 02/08/2013 by 3rd party, ECF. (AJP)
February 7, 2013 Filing 45 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Amicus Appellant Delaware State Bar Association, filed. (SEG)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER (VANASKIE, Circuit Judge) granting Motion by Delaware State Bar Association, The Corporation Law Section to Proceed as Amicus Curiae in Support of Appellant, filed. Judge: VANASKIE, Authoring. Appearance Form due on or before 02/11/2013. Disclosure Statement due on or before 02/11/2013. (MS)
January 25, 2013 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Amicus Appellee Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press - Amicus Brief. Copies: 10. (KEL)
January 25, 2013 Filing 42 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Amicus Appellees American Society of Newspaper Editors, Associated Press, Atlantic Media Inc, Bloomberg LP, EW Scripps Co, Gannett Co Inc, Maryland-Delaware District of Colombia Broadcasters Association, NPR Inc, NY Times Co, News Corp, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Reuters America LLC and Washington Post, filed. (BDB)
January 25, 2013 Filing 41 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bruce D. Brown on behalf of Amicus Curiae Reporters Comm for Frdm of the Press, Amer Soc of News Eds, Assoc Press, Atlantic Media Inc, Bloomberg LP, Dow Jones &Co Inc, EW Scripps Co, Gannett Co Inc, The Md-Del-DC B'casters Assn, New York Times Co, NPR Inc, Reuters America LLC, The Washington Post. (BDB)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER (Clerk) filed. Motion by the Reporters Committee for the Freedom of the Press and Twelve News Organizations for Leave to Proceed as Amici Curiae is denied as unnecessary. It is noted that all parties consent to the filing of the amicus brief. The motion will be forwarded tot he merits panel for purpouses of establishing consent. (MS)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER (Clerk) granting Appellants' Motion for extension of time to file reply brief until 2/8/13. Counsel is advised, however, to review the Court's notice of 10/15/12, advising that motions for extensions of time are disfavored, filed. (TYW)
January 17, 2013 Filing 38 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Scott L. Nelson on behalf of Amicus Curiae Public Citizen, Inc.. (SLN)
January 16, 2013 Filing 37 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief until/for 14 Days. Certificate of Service dated 01/16/2013. (AJP)
January 16, 2013 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Amicus Curiae Public Citizen, Inc. in support of Appellee - Amicus Brief. Copies: 10. (KEL)
January 14, 2013 Filing 35 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS/INTERVENOR BRIEF on behalf of The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al. in support of Appellee/Respondent, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/14/2013 by US mail, ECF. (MLB)
January 14, 2013 Filing 34 ECF FILER: Motion filed by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al. to proceed as Amicus Curiae in support of Appellee/Respondent. Certificate of Service dated 01/14/2013. - SEND TO MERITS PANEL for the Court's information only.--[Edited 01/17/2013 by MS] (MLB)
January 14, 2013 Filing 33 ECF FILER: Request by Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. for Oral Argument. [SEND TO MERITS] (AJP)
January 14, 2013 Filing 32 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS/INTERVENOR BRIEF on behalf of Amicus Public Citizen, Inc. in support of Appellee/Respondent, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/14/2013 by ECF. (SLN)
January 8, 2013 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc - Brief with Addendum attached. Copies: 10. (RM)
January 7, 2013 Filing 30 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of Appellee Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/07/2013 by ECF. (DLF)
December 19, 2012 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Proposed Amicus-Appellant Delaware State Bar Association - Amicus Brief with Addendum attached. Copies: 10. (RM)
December 19, 2012 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Proposed Amici-Appellants Business Roundtable and Chamber of Commerce of the USA - Amicus Brief. Copies: 10. (RM)
December 18, 2012 Filing 27 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS/INTERVENOR BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of The Corporation Law Section of the Delaware State Bar Association in support of Appellant/Petitioner, filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/18/2012 by ECF. (SMH)
December 18, 2012 Filing 26 ECF FILER: Motion filed by The Corporation Law Section of the Delaware State Bar Association to proceed as Amicus Curiae in support of Appellant/Petitioner. Certificate of Service dated 12/18/2012. (SMH)
December 18, 2012 Filing 25 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Roy T. Englert, Jr. on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America; Business Roundtable. (RTE)
December 18, 2012 Filing 24 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS/INTERVENOR BRIEF on behalf of Amici Curiae the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Business Roundtable in support of Appellant/Petitioner, filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/18/2012 by ECF, 3rd party. (RTE)
December 18, 2012 Filing 23 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from S. Mark Hurd on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Corporation Law Section of the Delaware State Bar Association. (SMH)
December 12, 2012 Filing 22 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX VOLUME I on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. Certificate of service dated 12/12/2012 by ECF. [Edited text to indicate Volume I]--[Edited 12/17/2012 by EAF] (AJP)
December 12, 2012 Filing 21 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Andrew J. Pincus, Esq. for Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq., Leo E. Strine, Jr., John W. Noble and J. Travis Laster Re-Filing: Volume 1 of Joint Appendix. Certificate of Service dated 12/12/2012. (AJP)
December 12, 2012 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 2 (Volume I attached to Brief). (MS)
December 12, 2012 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 10. (KEL)
December 11, 2012 Filing 18 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. Certificate of service dated 12/11/2012 by 3rd party, ECF. (AJP)
December 11, 2012 Filing 17 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/11/2012 by 3rd party, ECF. [Text edited to indicate Addendum attached, Appendix Volume I removed due to deficiency and re-filed as of 12/12/12]--[Edited 12/17/2012 by EAF] (AJP)
November 1, 2012 Filing 16 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Leo E. Strine Jr., Sam Glasscock III and Donald F. Parsons Jr. due on or before 12/11/2012. Appendix due on or before 12/11/2012. (TMM)
October 30, 2012 Filing 15 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Delaware Coalition for Open Government, filed. (DLF)
October 25, 2012 Filing 14 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., received. (AJP)
October 25, 2012 Filing 13 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. (AJP)
October 25, 2012 Filing 12 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr., filed. (AJP)
October 25, 2012 Filing 11 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew J Pincus on behalf of Appellant(s) The Hon. Leo E. Strine, Jr., The Hon. John W. Noble, The Hon. Donald F. Parsons, Jr., The Hon. J. Travis Laster, and The Hon. Sam Glasscock, III. (AJP)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Clerk) Appellants' letter regarding the case caption is construed as a motion to amend the caption, so construed, the motion is granted, filed. 1 filed. (TYW)
October 16, 2012 Filing 9 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David L. Finger on behalf of Appellee(s) Delaware Coalition for Open Government, Inc.. (DLF)
October 16, 2012 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lawrence A. Hamermesh on behalf of Appellant(s) The Hon. Leo E. Strine, Jr., The Hon. John W. Noble, The Hon. Donald F. Parsons, The Hon. J. Travis Laster, and The Hon. Sam Glasscock, III. (JEF)
October 15, 2012 Filing 7 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Joel E. Friedlander, Esq. for Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq., Leo E. Strine, Jr., John W. Noble and J. Travis Laster Letter to Ms. Marcia M. Waldron, Clerk of the Court Regarding Case Caption Discrepancies. Certificate of Service dated 10/15/2012. (JEF)
October 15, 2012 Filing 6 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. (JEF)
October 12, 2012 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey M. Gorris on behalf of Appellant(s) The Hon. Leo E. Strine, Jr., The Hon. John W. Noble, The Hon. Donald F. Parsons, The Hon. J. Travis Laster, and The Hon. Sam Glasscock, III. (JEF)
October 12, 2012 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andre G. Bouchard on behalf of Appellant(s) The Hon. Leo E. Strine, Jr., The Hon. John W. Noble, The Hon. Donald F. Parsons, The Hon. J. Travis Laster, and The Hon. Sam Glasscock, III. (JEF)
October 12, 2012 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joel Friedlander on behalf of Appellant(s) The Hon. Leo E. Strine, Jr., The Hon. John W. Noble, The Hon. Donald F. Parsons, The Hon. J. Travis Laster, and The Hon. Sam Glasscock, III. (JEF)
October 11, 2012 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TYW)
October 11, 2012 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Esq. and Leo E. Strine, Jr. in District Court No. 1-11-cv-01015. (TYW)

Search for this case: Delaware Coalition for Open Go v. Leo Strine, Jr., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: DELAWARE COALITION FOR OPEN GOVERNMENT
Represented By: David L. Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: HON LEO E. STRINE, JR.
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: HON JOHN W. NOBLE
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: HON DONALD F. PARSONS, JR., Esq.
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: SAM GLASSCOCK, III
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: HON. J. TRAVIS LASTER
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE COURT OF CHANCERY
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Andre G. Bouchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?