USA, et al v. One Palmetto State Armory PA 1, et al
Defendant: WATSON FAMILY GUN TRUST and ONE PALMETTO STATE ARMORY PA 15 MACHINEGUN RECEIVER FRAME UNKNOWN CALIBER SERIAL NUMBER LW001804
Amicus Curiae: THE HELLER FOUNDATION, INSTITUTE ON THE CONSTITUTION, GUN OWNERS OF CALIFORNIA INC, LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION and GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA INC
Defendant / Appellee: DIRECTOR BUREAU OF ALCOHOL TOBACCO FIREARMS & EXPLOSIVES and ATTORNEY GENERAL UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff / Appellant: RYAN S. WATSON, Individually and as Trustee of the Watson Family Gun Trust
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 15-2859
Filed: August 10, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2016 MANDATE ISSUED, filed. (TYW)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER (MCKEE, Chief Judge, AMBRO, FUENTES, SMITH, FISHER, CHAGARES, JORDAN, HARDIMAN, GREENAWAY JR., VANASKIE, SHWARTZ, KRAUSE, RESTREPO and *THOMPSON, Circuit Judges) denying Petition for Panel and En Banc Rehearing filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson, filed. Ambro, Authoring Judge. *Honorable Anne E. Thompson, District Judge for the United States Court for the District of New Jersey, sitting by designation voted as to panel rehearing only. (TYW)
June 10, 2016 ECF FILER: Petition filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson for Rehearing before original panel and the court en banc. Certificate of Service dated 06/10/2016. (SDS)
May 18, 2016 JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellant. (TYW)
May 18, 2016 PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: AMBRO, KRAUSE and *THOMPSON, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 17. Judge: THOMPSON Authoring. *Honorable Anne E. Thompson, District Judge for the United States Court for the District of New Jersey, sitting by designation. (TYW)
April 9, 2016 ECF FILER: Letter dated 04/09/2016 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant Ryan S. Watson. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. (SDS)
April 4, 2016 COURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [15-2859, 14-3812, 14-2966, 14-4127, 15-3061, 15-3117] (PM)
April 4, 2016 ARGUED on Monday, April 04, 2016. Panel: AMBRO, KRAUSE, Circuit Judges and THOMPSON, District Judge. Patrick Nemeroff arguing for Appellee Attorney General United States of America; Stephen D. Stamboulieh arguing for Appellant Ryan S. Watson. (PM)
March 28, 2016 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Attorney General United States of America, Director Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives and USA to Rule 28(j) letter. Certificate of Service dated 03/28/2016. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. (PN)
March 22, 2016 ECF FILER: Letter dated 03/22/2016 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant Ryan S. Watson. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. (SDS)
March 15, 2016 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Attorney General United States of America, Director Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives and USA to Rule 28(j) letter. Certificate of Service dated 03/15/2016. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. (PN)
March 9, 2016 ECF FILER: Letter dated 03/09/2016 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant Ryan S. Watson. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. (SDS)
March 3, 2016 Oral Argument Notification for Monday, 04/04/2016. (PM)
February 22, 2016 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Patrick Nemeroff, Esq. for Appellees Director Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives, Attorney General United States of America and USA. Certificate of Service dated 02/22/2016. (PN)
February 13, 2016 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Stephen D. Stamboulieh, Esq. for Appellant Ryan S. Watson. Certificate of Service dated 02/13/2016. (SDS)
February 10, 2016 Calendared for Tuesday, 04/05/2016. (TLG)
February 8, 2016 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Ryan S. Watson - Reply Brief. Copies: 7. (RM)
February 4, 2016 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Ryan S. Watson, filed. Certificate of Service dated 02/04/2016 by ECF. (SDS)
February 3, 2016 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Alan A. Beck, Esq. for Appellant Ryan S. Watson and Non-Participating One Palmetto State Armory PA 15 Machinegun Receiver Frame Unknown Caliber Serial Number LW001804 and Watson Family Gun Trust. (AAB)
February 1, 2016 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Patrick Nemeroff, Esq. for Appellees Director Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives, Attorney General United States of America and USA. Counsel is unavailable for the following dates: 04/08/2016, (PN)
January 30, 2016 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Stephen D. Stamboulieh, Esq. for Appellant Ryan S. Watson and Non-Participating Watson Family Gun Trust. Counsel is unavailable for the following dates: 04/07/2016, (SDS)
January 29, 2016 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Amicus Appellee Law Center To Prevent Gun Violence in support of Appellee/Respondent - Amicus Brief. Copies: 7. (KEL)
January 28, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Adam Regoli on behalf of Amicus Curiae Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (AMR)
January 28, 2016 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS/INTERVENOR BRIEF on behalf of Amicus-Appellee Law Center To Prevent Gun Violence in support of Appellee/Respondent, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/28/2016 by ECF. F.R.A.P. 29(a) Permission: YES. (AMR)
January 28, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James R. McGuire on behalf of Amicus Curiae Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (AMR)
January 28, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jordan Eth on behalf of Amicus Curiae Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (AMR)
January 27, 2016 ECF FILER: CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan Alexander Beck on behalf of Appellant(s) Ryan S. Watson, Individual and as Trustee of the Watson Family Gun Trust.--[Edited 01/27/2016 by TYW] (AAB)
January 22, 2016 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees Attorney General United States of America, Director Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives and USA - Brief. Copies: 7. (SJB)
January 21, 2016 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellees Attorney General United States of America, Director Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives and USA, filed. Certificate of Service dated 01/21/2016 by ECF. (PN)
January 13, 2016 Clerk's letter to counsel for appellee(s)/respondent(s) Watson Family Gun Trust and One Palmetto State Armory PA requesting response within 10 days on the intention of participation in this appeal. (TYW)
December 14, 2015 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Proposed Amici-Appellants Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America Inc, Gun Owners of California Inc, Institute on the Constitution and The Heller Foundation - Amicus Brief. Copies: 7. (RM)
December 11, 2015 Appellees Attorney General United States of America, Director Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives and USA verbally granted an extension of time to file brief until 01/21/2016pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. (TYW)
December 9, 2015 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC AMICUS/INTERVENOR BRIEF on behalf of Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Heller Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Institute on the Constitution in support of Appellant/Petitioner, filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/09/2015 by ECF. F.R.A.P. 29(a) Permission: YES. (RJO)
December 9, 2015 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert J. Olson on behalf of Amicus Curiae Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Heller Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Institute on the Constitution. (RJO)
December 4, 2015 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Ryan S. Watson - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. (RS)
December 2, 2015 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Ryan S. Watson, filed. Certificate of Service dated 12/02/2015 by ECF. (SDS)
December 2, 2015 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Ryan S. Watson, filed. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2015 by ECF. (SDS)
October 9, 2015 TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting Motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson. Appellant's brief and appendix must be filed and served on or before December 2, 2015. Counsel is advised to review the Court's Notice of October 15, 2012 advising that extensions of time are disfavored., filed. (ARR)
October 6, 2015 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Brief until/for December 2, 2015. Certificate of Service dated 10/06/2015.--[Edited 10/08/2015 by TYW] (SDS)
September 28, 2015 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan Beck on behalf of Appellant(s) Watson Family Gun Trust. (AAB)
September 15, 2015 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief and Appendix on behalf of Appellant Ryan S. Watson due on or before 10/26/2015. (TYW)
September 15, 2015 CLERK ORDER advising that it appears it would not be appropriate to list the case for possible dismissal, filed. (TYW)
August 19, 2015 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Attorney General United States of America, Director Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives and USA to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 08/19/2015.--[Edited 08/19/2015 by TYW] (PN)
August 15, 2015 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson and Appellee Watson Family Gun Trust to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 08/15/2015. (SDS)
August 11, 2015 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America; Attorney General of the United States of America; Director of the Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives. (PN)
August 11, 2015 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Patrick G. Nemeroff on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America; Attorney General of the United States of America; Director of the Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives. (PN)
August 10, 2015 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen D. Stamboulieh on behalf of Appellant(s) Ryan S. Watson, Individually and as Trustee of the Watson Family Gun Trust. (SDS)
August 10, 2015 CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect., filed. (OM)
August 10, 2015 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (OM)
August 10, 2015 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson and Appellee Watson Family Gun Trust advising this court that no transcripts are available. (SDS)
August 10, 2015 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Ryan S. Watson and Appellee Watson Family Gun Trust, filed. (SDS)
August 10, 2015 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson and Appellee Watson Family Gun Trust, received. (SDS)
August 10, 2015 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson in District Court No. 2-15-cv-02202,2-14-cv-06569. (OM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA, et al v. One Palmetto State Armory PA 1, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE HELLER FOUNDATION
Represented By: Robert J. Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INSTITUTE ON THE CONSTITUTION
Represented By: Robert J. Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS OF CALIFORNIA INC
Represented By: Robert J. Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: James R. McGuire
Represented By: Adam M. Regoli Esq.
Represented By: Jordan Eth Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Robert J. Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Robert J. Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA INC
Represented By: Robert J. Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIRECTOR BUREAU OF ALCOHOL TOBACCO FIREARMS & EXPLOSIVES
Represented By: Michael S. Raab Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Riess Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Nemeroff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael S. Raab Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Riess Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Nemeroff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON FAMILY GUN TRUST
Represented By: Alan A. Beck Esq.
Represented By: David R. Scott Esq.
Represented By: Stephen D. Stamboulieh Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE PALMETTO STATE ARMORY PA 15 MACHINEGUN RECEIVER FRAME UNKNOWN CALIBER SERIAL NUMBER LW001804
Represented By: Alan A. Beck Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN S. WATSON, Individually and as Trustee of the Watson Family Gun Trust
Represented By: Alan A. Beck Esq.
Represented By: David R. Scott Esq.
Represented By: Stephen D. Stamboulieh Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael S. Raab Esq.
Represented By: J. Alvin Stout Esq. III
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Romero Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Nemeroff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?