Securities & Exchange Comm v. Arkadiy Dubovoy, et al
Defendant: IGOR DUBOVOY, ALEKSANDR GARKUSHA, ANDRIY SUPRANONOK, VITALY KORCHEVSKY, JASPEN CAPITAL PARTNERS LTD, OLEKSANDR MAKAROV, BERING EXPLORER FUND LTD, SOUTHEASTERN HOLDING AND INVESTMENT CO LLC, MAXIM ZAKHARCHENKO, CONCORDE BERMUDA LTD, OLEKSANDER IEREMENKO, GUIBOR SA, ARKADIY DUBOVOY, EXANTE LTD, APD DEVELOPERS LLC, ROMAN LAWLINSKIY, NIKOLAI SLEPENKOV, NELIA DUBOVOY, NTS CAPITAL FUND, VLADISLAV KHALUPSKY, ESCANDA LOGISTICS LTD, IVAN TURCHYNOV, OMEGA 26 INVESTMENTS LTD, MEMELLAND INVESTMENTS LTD, BERATTO GROUP LTD, PAVEL DUBOVOY, GLOBAL HEDGE CAPITAL GROUP, ALEXANDER FEDOSEEV and LEONID MOMOTOK
Defendant / Appellant: COPPERSTONE CAPITAL, OCEAN PRIME INC, COPPERSTONE ALPHA FUND, DAVID AMARYAN and INTERTRADE PACIFIC SA
Plaintiff / Appellee: SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Case Number: 15-3982
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), filed. (CJG) [Entered: 04/14/2016 01:33 PM]
April 14, 2016 ECF FILER: Motion to Withdraw Case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) filed by Appellants David Amaryan, Copperstone Alpha Fund, Copperstone Capital, Intertrade Pacific SA and Ocean Prime Inc without costs. Certificate of Service dated 04/14/2016. (JWM) [Entered: 04/14/2016 12:33 PM]
March 16, 2016 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Sammi Malek, Esq. for Appellants David Amaryan, Intertrade Pacific SA, Ocean Prime Inc, Copperstone Alpha Fund and Copperstone Capital Letter to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. Certificate of Service dated 03/16/2016. (SM) [Entered: 03/16/2016 03:39 PM]
January 25, 2016 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (SY) [Entered: 01/25/2016 02:17 PM]
January 13, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John V. Donnelly, III on behalf of Appellee(s) Securities and Exchange Commission. (JVD) [Entered: 01/13/2016 03:02 PM]
January 7, 2016 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Robert E. Griffin, Esq. for Exante Ltd, Yonatan Y. Jacobs, Esq. for Memelland Investments Ltd, Matthew I. Menchel, Esq. for Guibor SA and Omega 26 Investments Ltd, Kelly J. Spatola, Esq. for Guibor SA and Omega 26 Investments Ltd and Seth T. Taube, Esq. for Concorde Bermuda Ltd requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/21/2016. Disclosure Statement on or before 01/21/2016. (CJG) [Entered: 01/07/2016 01:48 PM]
January 5, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John J. Carney on behalf of Appellant(s) David Amaryan, Ocean Prime, Inc., Intertrade Pacific SA, Copperstone Capital, Copperstone Alpha Fund. (JJC) [Entered: 01/05/2016 01:59 PM]
January 4, 2016 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants David Amaryan, Copperstone Alpha Fund, Copperstone Capital, Intertrade Pacific SA and Ocean Prime Inc advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. (MEH) [Entered: 01/04/2016 06:37 PM]
January 4, 2016 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants David Amaryan, Copperstone Alpha Fund, Copperstone Capital, Intertrade Pacific SA and Ocean Prime Inc, received. (MEH) [Entered: 01/04/2016 06:34 PM]
January 4, 2016 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Copperstone Capital, filed. (MEH) [Entered: 01/04/2016 06:32 PM]
January 4, 2016 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Copperstone Alpha Fund, filed. (MEH) [Entered: 01/04/2016 06:31 PM]
January 4, 2016 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Intertrade Pacific SA, filed. (MEH) [Entered: 01/04/2016 06:29 PM]
January 4, 2016 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Ocean Prime Inc, filed. (MEH) [Entered: 01/04/2016 06:28 PM]
January 4, 2016 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants David Amaryan, Copperstone Alpha Fund, Copperstone Capital, Intertrade Pacific SA and Ocean Prime Inc, filed. (MEH) [Entered: 01/04/2016 06:23 PM]
January 4, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Margaret E. Hirce on behalf of Appellant(s) David Amaryan, Ocean Prime, Inc., Intertrade Pacific SA, Copperstone Capital, Copperstone Alpha Fund. (MEH) [Entered: 01/04/2016 06:18 PM]
January 4, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sammi Malek on behalf of Appellant(s) David Amaryan, Ocean Prime, Inc., Intertrade Pacific SA, Copperstone Capital, Copperstone Alpha Fund. (SM) [Entered: 01/04/2016 06:13 PM]
January 4, 2016 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John W. Moscow on behalf of Appellant(s) David Amaryan, Ocean Prime, Inc., Intertrade Pacific SA, Copperstone Capital, Copperstone Alpha Fund. (JWM) [Entered: 01/04/2016 06:07 PM]
December 18, 2015 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Susan S. McDonald on behalf of Appellee(s) Securities and Exchange Commission. (SSM) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:35 PM]
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) The United States of America has a motion to intervene pending in the District Court. The United States of America is directed to advise this Court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order if it will participate in the appeal and, if so, what party it will support. Failure to respond to this order will be deemed as a notice of non-participation, filed. (CJG) [Entered: 12/18/2015 09:34 AM]
December 18, 2015 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 12/18/2015 09:29 AM]
December 18, 2015 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants David Amaryan, Copperstone Alpha Fund, Copperstone Capital, Intertrade Pacific SA and Ocean Prime Inc in District Court No. 2-15-cv-06076. (CJG) [Entered: 12/18/2015 09:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Securities & Exchange Comm v. Arkadiy Dubovoy, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGOR DUBOVOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEKSANDR GARKUSHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRIY SUPRANONOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VITALY KORCHEVSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASPEN CAPITAL PARTNERS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLEKSANDR MAKAROV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERING EXPLORER FUND LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHEASTERN HOLDING AND INVESTMENT CO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXIM ZAKHARCHENKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONCORDE BERMUDA LTD
Represented By: Seth T. Taube Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLEKSANDER IEREMENKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUIBOR SA
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel Esq.
Represented By: Kelly J. Spatola Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARKADIY DUBOVOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXANTE LTD
Represented By: Robert E. Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APD DEVELOPERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROMAN LAWLINSKIY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIKOLAI SLEPENKOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELIA DUBOVOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTS CAPITAL FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VLADISLAV KHALUPSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESCANDA LOGISTICS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAN TURCHYNOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMEGA 26 INVESTMENTS LTD
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel Esq.
Represented By: Kelly J. Spatola Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEMELLAND INVESTMENTS LTD
Represented By: Yonatan Y. Jacobs Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERATTO GROUP LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAVEL DUBOVOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL HEDGE CAPITAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDER FEDOSEEV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEONID MOMOTOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COPPERSTONE CAPITAL
Represented By: John W. Moscow Esq.
Represented By: John J. Carney Esq.
Represented By: Margaret E. Hirce Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OCEAN PRIME INC
Represented By: John W. Moscow Esq.
Represented By: John J. Carney Esq.
Represented By: Margaret E. Hirce Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COPPERSTONE ALPHA FUND
Represented By: John W. Moscow Esq.
Represented By: John J. Carney Esq.
Represented By: Margaret E. Hirce Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVID AMARYAN
Represented By: John W. Moscow Esq.
Represented By: John J. Carney Esq.
Represented By: Margaret E. Hirce Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: INTERTRADE PACIFIC SA
Represented By: John W. Moscow Esq.
Represented By: John J. Carney Esq.
Represented By: Margaret E. Hirce Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Susan S. McDonald Esq.
Represented By: John V. Donnelly Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?