Karen Schultz v. Patenaude & Felix, et al
Defendant / Appellee: PATENAUDE & FELIX and CACH LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: KAREN SCHULTZ, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Case Number: 19-1004
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:07 PM]
January 23, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Patenaude & Felix, filed. [19-1004] (DRB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:06 AM]
January 23, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel R. Bentz, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Patenaude & Felix, AECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel R. Bentz, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Patenaude & Felix, A{C. [19-1004] (DRB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:03 AM]
January 22, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas M. Pie', Jr., Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Patenaude & Felix, APC. [19-1004] (TP) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:57 PM]
January 14, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Karen Schultz, filed. [19-1004] (CSM) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:09 PM]
January 14, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Karen Schultz, received. [19-1004] (CSM) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:07 PM]
January 14, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Karen Schultz advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-1004] (CSM) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:06 PM]
January 14, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Clayton S. Morrow on behalf of Appellant(s) Karen Schultz. [19-1004] (CSM) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:04 PM]
January 14, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark J. Golen, II on behalf of Appellee(s) CACH, LLC. [19-1004] (MJG) [Entered: 01/14/2019 08:24 AM]
January 9, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Cach LLC, filed. [19-1004] (JL) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:35 AM]
January 9, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jessica G. Lucas on behalf of Appellee(s) CACH, LLC. [19-1004] (JL) [Entered: 01/09/2019 11:22 AM]
January 3, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 01/03/2019 05:40 PM]
January 3, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Karen Schultz in District Court No. 2-18-cv-00489. (PDB) [Entered: 01/03/2019 05:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Karen Schultz v. Patenaude & Felix, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATENAUDE & FELIX
Represented By: Thomas Pie Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Daniel R. Bentz Esq. I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CACH LLC
Represented By: Jessica Lucas Esq.
Represented By: Mark J. Golen Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAREN SCHULTZ, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Clayton S. Morrow Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Suher Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?