Jason Brown v. Lisa Brown

Defendant: LISA M. BROWN
Plaintiff / Appellant: JASON L. BROWN
Case Number: 19-1053
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) It is hereby ordered that the briefing and scheduling order issued on 01/09/2019 is vacated. A new briefing schedule will issue at the appropriate time upon disposition of the motion for appointment of counsel, filed. (JK) [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:53 PM]
January 18, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Jason L. Brown for Appointment of Counsel. (JK) [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:52 PM]
January 9, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Jason L. Brown due on or before 02/19/2019. Appendix due on or before 02/19/2019.--[VACATED PER CLERK'S ORDER DATED 01/30/2019 - Edited 01/30/2019 by JK] (JK) [Entered: 01/09/2019 09:39 AM]
January 7, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 01/07/2019 10:04 AM]
January 7, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jason L. Brown in District Court No. 3-18-mc-00676. (JK) [Entered: 01/07/2019 09:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason Brown v. Lisa Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON L. BROWN
Represented By: Jason L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA M. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?