Kelly Rau v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Ins
Plaintiff / Appellant: KELLY A. RAU
Defendant / Appellee: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO
Case Number: 19-1078
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Kelly A. Rau due on or before 04/15/2019. Appendix due on or before 04/15/2019. (KR) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:34 PM]
January 30, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:20 PM]
January 30, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Co, filed. [19-1078] (KMJ) [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:01 AM]
January 24, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kristin Jones, Esq. for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Co and Marshall J. Walthew, Esq. for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Co requesting the following document(s): Disclosure Statement on or before 02/07/2019. (KR) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:54 PM]
January 22, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Kelly A. Rau, received. [19-1078] (MF) [Entered: 01/22/2019 06:01 PM]
January 22, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Kelly A. Rau, filed. [19-1078] (MF) [Entered: 01/22/2019 05:58 PM]
January 22, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Kelly A. Rau advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-1078] (MF) [Entered: 01/22/2019 05:56 PM]
January 22, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Melissa J. Foley on behalf of Appellant(s) Kelly A. Rau. [19-1078] (MF) [Entered: 01/22/2019 05:55 PM]
January 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mr. Marshall Walthew on behalf of Appellee(s) Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. [19-1078] (MJW) [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:08 PM]
January 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mrs. Kristin H. Jones on behalf of Appellee(s) Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. [19-1078] (KMJ) [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:57 PM]
January 9, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 01/09/2019 09:06 AM]
January 9, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Kelly A. Rau in District Court No. 3-16-cv-00359. (KR) [Entered: 01/09/2019 08:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kelly Rau v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Ins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KELLY A. RAU
Represented By: Melissa Foley Esq.
Represented By: Susan L. Luckenbill Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CO
Represented By: Kristin M. Jones Esq.
Represented By: Marshall J. Walthew Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?