Marcus James v. Gregory, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WARDEN GERALD MAY, LIEUTENANT REYNOLDS, MR. JAMES KENNEY, Mayor of Philadelphia, MAJOR FRANK ABELLO, MS. BLANCHE CARNEY, Commissioner of Philadelphia Prison System and SERGEANT GREGORY
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARCUS JAMES
Case Number: 19-1257
Filed: January 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) Action on the Letter from Appellant, which was handwritten on a copy of the February 19, 2019 Clerk's Order grating a motion for extension of time to file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, is hereby deferred. It is unclear if Appellant is indicating that he will not be filing the motion to proceed in forma pauperis and other required forms or if he is withdrawing his notice of appeal. Appellant is advised that if the appeal is withdrawn, Appellant will be forfeiting the rights to appellate review of the District Court's orders and/or judgment. Once an appeal is withdrawn, it can be reinstated only upon formal motion demonstrating good cause why the appeal should be reopened. The granting of such a motion is a matter entirely within the Court's discretion and that relief will not be routinely granted. If Appellant wishes to withdraw the appeal, he should file a motion requesting such. Alternatively, if Appellant does wish to continue with the appeal, he must file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and all other required forms as directed in the February 19, 2019 Clerk's Order. The motion and forms must be filed within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Failure to file the motion and forms will result dismissal of the appeal without further notice. See 3d Cir. L.A.R. 3.3 and Misc. 107.1, filed. (MB) [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:14 AM]
March 11, 2019 Letter from Appellant indicating that he is not going to appeal the decision regarding No. 19-1257. Certificate of Service dated 03/20/2019. Service made by ECF. (MB) [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:02 AM]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) granting motion for extension of time to file for IFP filed by Appellant Marcus James. Appellant must either pay to the district court the entire docketing and filing fee of $505.00 or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, along with an addendum to the affidavit in support of the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, a completed form authorizing assessments to be made from his prison account, and a certified prison account statement within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Should Appellant fail to either pay the fees or file the motion within the time stated, he will face dismissal of the appeal pursuant to Third Circuit LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1 without further notice, filed. (MB) [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:26 AM]
February 11, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellant Marcus James treated as Motion for Extension of Time to File for In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 02/05/2019. Service made by US mail. (ARR) [Entered: 02/12/2019 04:31 PM]
January 30, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Elise Bruhl on behalf of Appellee(s) Sergeant Gregory, Lieutenant Reynolds, Major Frank Abello, Warden Gerald May, Blanche Carney, Jim Kenney. [19-1257] (EMB) [Entered: 01/30/2019 10:50 AM]
January 30, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 01/30/2019 08:50 AM]
January 30, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Marcus James in District Court No. 2-17-cv-00047. (MB) [Entered: 01/30/2019 08:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marcus James v. Gregory, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN GERALD MAY
Represented By: Elise M. Bruhl Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Pomager Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIEUTENANT REYNOLDS
Represented By: Elise M. Bruhl Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Pomager Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MR. JAMES KENNEY, Mayor of Philadelphia
Represented By: Elise M. Bruhl Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Pomager Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAJOR FRANK ABELLO
Represented By: Elise M. Bruhl Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Pomager Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MS. BLANCHE CARNEY, Commissioner of Philadelphia Prison System
Represented By: Elise M. Bruhl Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Pomager Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT GREGORY
Represented By: Elise M. Bruhl Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Pomager Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARCUS JAMES
Represented By: Marcus James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?