Nautilus Insurance Co v. 200 Christian Street Partners, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DEBORAH GORDON KLEHR, H/W, HARMAN DEUTSCH CORP, ARTHUR ELWOOD, E&A DRYWALL CORP, HIGH END DESIGN INSTALLATIONS LLC, ZACHARY KLEHR, PHILLY BRICK AND STONE RESTORATION LLC, 200 CHRISTIAN STREET PARTNERS LLC, TIR EOGHAIN CONSRUCTION INC, d/b/a Duggan Excavation, JELD WEN WINDOWS AND DOORS, MAXI TECH ROOFING INC, TAGUE LUMBER OF MEDIA INC, STRAWBRIDGE CROWE LLC, t/a J. Maloney & Son, AB CONSTRUCTION LLC and VIRGIL PROCACCINO
Plaintiff / Appellant: NAUTILUS INSURANCE CO
Case Number: 19-1507
Filed: March 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 ECF FILER: CORRECTED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees 200 Christian Street Partners LLC, Arthur Elwood and Virgil Procaccino, filed. [19-1507] (JAC) [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:32 AM]
April 3, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan A. Cass on behalf of Appellee(s) 200 Christian Street Partners, LLC, Virgil Procaccino and Arthur Elwood. [19-1507] (JAC) [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:27 AM]
April 3, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee 200 Christian Street Partners LLC, filed. [19-1507] (JAC) [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:23 AM]
March 20, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Nautilus Insurance Co advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [19-1507] (EMK) [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:53 PM]
March 20, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Nautilus Insurance Co, received. [19-1507] (EMK) [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:52 PM]
March 20, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Nautilus Insurance Co, filed. [19-1507] (EMK) [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:51 PM]
March 20, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Nautilus Insurance Co, filed. [19-1507] (EMK) [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:50 PM]
March 20, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Edward M. Koch on behalf of Appellant(s) Nautilus Insurance Company. [19-1507] (EMK) [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:49 PM]
March 7, 2019 CLERK ORDER consolidating for all purposes the Appeals at Nos. 19-1506 and 19-1507. The parties are advised that all case opening forms, motions and briefs must be electronically filed in all cases on the Courts electronic case filing (ECF) system, filed. [19-1506, 19-1507]--[Edited 03/07/2019 by SB] (SB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 02:06 PM]
March 7, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:45 AM]
March 7, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Nautilus Insurance Co in District Court No. 2-18-cv-01545. (SB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:44 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Co v. 200 Christian Street Partners, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBORAH GORDON KLEHR, H/W
Represented By: Peter R. Bryant Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HARMAN DEUTSCH CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARTHUR ELWOOD
Represented By: Jonathan A. Cass Esq.
Represented By: Carl Engel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E&A DRYWALL CORP
Represented By: Jay D. Branderbit Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HIGH END DESIGN INSTALLATIONS LLC
Represented By: Feeda R. Musitief Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZACHARY KLEHR
Represented By: Peter R. Bryant Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILLY BRICK AND STONE RESTORATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 200 CHRISTIAN STREET PARTNERS LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Cass Esq.
Represented By: Carl Engel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIR EOGHAIN CONSRUCTION INC, d/b/a Duggan Excavation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JELD WEN WINDOWS AND DOORS
Represented By: Harris N. Feldman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAXI TECH ROOFING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TAGUE LUMBER OF MEDIA INC
Represented By: Harris N. Feldman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STRAWBRIDGE CROWE LLC, t/a J. Maloney & Son
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AB CONSTRUCTION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGIL PROCACCINO
Represented By: Jonathan A. Cass Esq.
Represented By: Carl Engel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NAUTILUS INSURANCE CO
Represented By: Edward M. Koch Esq.
Represented By: Anthony L. Miscioscia Esq.
Represented By: Timothy A. Carroll Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?