Philip Vonville v. Superintendent Mahanoy SCI, et al
Defendant / Appellant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY and SUPERINTENDENT MAHANOY SCI
Plaintiff / Appellee: PHILIP J. VONVILLE
Case Number: 19-1629
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant District Attorney Monroe County advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-1629] (MSM) [Entered: 04/24/2019 10:56 AM]
April 24, 2019 NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellants District Attorney Monroe County and Superintendent Mahanoy SCI requesting that Transcript Purchase Order needs signature of counsel. Compliance due 04/29/2019. (MB) [Entered: 04/24/2019 07:58 AM]
April 24, 2019 COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Signed Transcript Purchase Order received from Appellants District Attorney Monroe County and Superintendent Mahanoy SCI. (MB) [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:59 PM]
April 24, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants District Attorney Monroe County and Superintendent Mahanoy SCI due on or before 06/03/2019. Appendix due on or before 06/03/2019. (MB) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:01 PM]
April 23, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants District Attorney Monroe County and Superintendent Mahanoy SCI, filed. [19-1629] (MSM) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:25 PM]
April 23, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark S. Matthews, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Superintendent Mahanoy SCI, Pennsylvania Attorney General, Monroe County District Attorney. [19-1629] (MSM) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:21 PM]
April 23, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant District Attorney Monroe County, received. [19-1629] (MSM) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:27 PM]
April 23, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant District Attorney Monroe County advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-1629] (MSM) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:28 PM]
April 10, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Andrew M. Kroeckel, Esq. for District Attorney Monroe County and Superintendent Mahanoy SCI and Mark S. Matthews, Esq. for District Attorney Monroe County and Superintendent Mahanoy SCI requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/24/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 04/24/2019. Information Statement on or before 04/24/2019. Concise Summary on or before 04/24/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 04/24/2019. (MB) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:49 PM]
April 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Frederick W. Ulrich on behalf of Appellee(s) Philip J. Vonville. [19-1629] (FWU) [Entered: 04/08/2019 01:26 PM]
March 25, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants District Attorney Monroe County and Superintendent Mahanoy SCI in District Court No. 3-14-cv-01582. (MB) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:32 AM]
March 25, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:42 AM]
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER appointing FPD to represent Appellee Philip J. Vonville, filed. (MB) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:44 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Philip Vonville v. Superintendent Mahanoy SCI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY
Represented By: Mark S. Matthews Esq.
Represented By: Andrew M. Kroeckel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SUPERINTENDENT MAHANOY SCI
Represented By: Mark S. Matthews Esq.
Represented By: Andrew M. Kroeckel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PHILIP J. VONVILLE
Represented By: Frederick W. Ulrich Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?