William DeForte v. Borough of Worthington, et al
Defendant / Appellee: KEVIN FEENEY, Individually and as Mayor of the Borough of Worthington, JOSEPH R. ZANDARSKI, GERALD RODGERS, Individually and as a Police Officer of the Borough of Worthington, Jointly and Severally and BOROUGH OF WORTHINGTON
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIAM DEFORTE
Case Number: 19-1755
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 9, 2021 William DeForte v. Borough of Worthington

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. [19-1755, 19-1762] (TNH) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:53 PM]
May 29, 2019 CLERK ORDER advising that it appears it would not be appropriate to list the case for possible dismissal. All responses filed by the parties regarding the jurisdictional issue are referred to the Merits Panel. This does not any way signify that a determination of jurisdiction has been made. Only the Court can make such a decision. The parties are directed to address this Court's jurisdiction in their briefs, filed. [19-1755, 19-1762] (KR) [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:09 PM]
April 26, 2019 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER (Part III) notifying transcript by Court Reporter Ms. Barbara Leo in 19-1755, 19-1762 filed in District Court on 04/22/2019. Actual Pages: 73. [19-1755, 19-1762] (PDB) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:38 AM]
April 25, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kemal Alexander Mericli on behalf of Appellee(s) Joseph R. Zandarski. [19-1755] (KAM) [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:55 AM]
April 23, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael E. Kennedy, Esq. for Joseph R. Zandarski requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/07/2019. (KR) [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:01 AM]
April 22, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Erica L. Laughlin on behalf of Appellee(s) Gerald Rodgers. Wrong document attached removed - Document refiled correctly---[Edited 04/22/2019 by KR] (ELL) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:27 PM]
April 22, 2019 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Gerald Rodgers to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 04/22/2019. [SEND TO MERITS]--[Edited 05/29/2019 by KR] (ELL) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:01 PM]
April 22, 2019 ECF FILER: CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Erica L. Laughlin on behalf of Appellee(s) Gerald Rodgers.--[Edited 04/22/2019 by KR] (ELL) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:56 PM]
April 22, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant William DeForte in 19-1755, 19-1762, received. [19-1755, 19-1762] (LEB) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:53 PM]
April 22, 2019 ECF FILER: CORRECTED Response filed by Appellant William DeForte to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 04/22/2019. [19-1755, 19-1762] [SEND TO MERITS]--[Edited 05/29/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/22/2019 09:07 PM]
April 22, 2019 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant William DeForte to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 04/22/2019. Service made by ECF. Document removed - Corrected Response was filed. [19-1755, 19-1762]--[Edited 04/23/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:57 PM]
April 22, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Erica L. Laughlin on behalf of Appellee(s) Gerald Rodgers. Wrong document attached removed - Document refiled correctly--[Edited 04/22/2019 by KR] (ELL) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:56 PM]
April 19, 2019 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Borough of Worthington and Kevin Feeney to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 04/19/2019. [SEND TO MERITS]--[Edited 05/29/2019 by KR] (SLB) [Entered: 04/19/2019 01:58 PM]
April 18, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sheryl L. Brown, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Borough of Worthington and Kevin Feeney. --[Edited 04/18/2019 by KR] (SLB) [Entered: 04/18/2019 01:27 PM]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER to Court Reporter Ms. Barbara Leo directing transcripts, ordered on 04/08/2019, to be filed by 05/13/2019. [19-1755, 19-1762] (KR) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:41 AM]
April 8, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant William DeForte in 19-1755, 19-1762 advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Barbara Leo. [19-1755, 19-1762] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:04 AM]
April 8, 2019 CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. All parties must file written responses addressing these jurisdictional issues, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order., filed. [19-1755, 19-1762] (KR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:35 AM]
April 8, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 08:18 AM]
April 8, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant William DeForte, filed. [19-1755, 19-1762]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:05 AM]
April 8, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Consolidating for All Purposes, filed. [19-1755, 19-1762] (KR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:28 AM]
April 8, 2019 ECF FILER: CORRECTED Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant William DeForte in advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: Transcript of hearing regarding Motion for Summary Judgment - 11-26-18., to be filed by Barara Leo. [19-1755, 19-1762]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:18 PM]
April 8, 2019 ECF FILER: CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lawrence E. Bolind, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) William DeForte. ]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:50 PM]
April 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lawrence E. Bolind, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) William DeForte. --[Edited 04/09/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:24 PM]
April 8, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant William DeForte in District Court No. 2-16-cv-00067. (KR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 08:14 AM]
April 8, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant William DeForte, filed. [19-1755, 19-1762]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by KR] (LEB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William DeForte v. Borough of Worthington, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN FEENEY, Individually and as Mayor of the Borough of Worthington
Represented By: Sheryl L. Brown Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSEPH R. ZANDARSKI
Represented By: Michael E. Kennedy Esq.
Represented By: Kemal A. Mericli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GERALD RODGERS, Individually and as a Police Officer of the Borough of Worthington, Jointly and Severally
Represented By: Alan T. Shuckrow Esq.
Represented By: Erica L. Laughlin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOROUGH OF WORTHINGTON
Represented By: Sheryl L. Brown Esq.
Represented By: Eric M. Brown Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM DEFORTE
Represented By: Lawrence E. Bolind Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?