Wilbert Proffitt v. Warden Philadelphia FDC
Defendant / Appellee: WARDEN PHILADELPHIA FDC
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILBERT EUGENE PROFFITT, 73 YEARS OLD, CASE 47 YEARS OLD
Case Number: 19-2102
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellant Mr. Wilbert Eugene Proffitt requesting either a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or payment of the filing fee. Compliance due 07/08/2019. (JK) [Entered: 06/24/2019 10:39 AM]
June 18, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellant Wilbert Eugene Proffitt, construed as a Motion to Reopen Appeal, received and not filed. Certificate of Service dated 06/24/2019. Service made by ECF. (JK) [Entered: 06/24/2019 10:38 AM]
June 7, 2019 CLERK ORDER dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to pay the filing fee for the notice of appeal. Case terminated on 06/07/2019. (JK) [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:27 PM]
May 17, 2019 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for possible summary action. (MW) [Entered: 05/17/2019 11:40 AM]
May 15, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:36 AM]
May 15, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Wilbert Eugene Proffitt in District Court No. 2-18-cv-00705. (JK) [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wilbert Proffitt v. Warden Philadelphia FDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN PHILADELPHIA FDC
Represented By: Laurie Magid Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILBERT EUGENE PROFFITT, 73 YEARS OLD, CASE 47 YEARS OLD
Represented By: Wilbert Eugene Proffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?