Manuel Lampon-Paz v. DOJ, et al
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff / Appellant: MANUEL LAMPON-PAZ
Case Number: 19-2119
Filed: May 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 1, 2019 Manuel Lampon-Paz v. DOJ

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) Action on the foregoing motion is hereby deferred. Appellant indicates in the motion for leave to lodge exhibits that the exhibits he wishes to submit are attached to motion. Upon review of the motion, there does not appear to be any exhibits attached. If Appellant wishes for the motion for leave to lodge exhibits to be considered by the Court, Appellant must file a supplement to the motion to include the proposed exhibits within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Should Appellant fail to file the supplement to the motion within the time stated, no further action will be taken on the motion for leave to lodge exhibits. Answer due 08/08/2019. (EMA) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:26 PM]
July 28, 2019 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz for injunction on Defendants in Illegally Acquiring pro Se Privileged Work Prior to My Filing. Certificate of Service dated 07/28/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2119] (ML) [Entered: 07/28/2019 10:28 AM]
July 25, 2019 ECF FILER: RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz to Appellees' Request for an Extension of Time to File Brief, filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/25/2019 by ECF. [19-2119]--[Edited 07/26/2019 by ARR to correct event and docket text.] (ML) [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:44 AM]
July 24, 2019 SECOND FOLLOW UP LETTER to John Regina, Esq. for State of New Jersey requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/07/2019. (ARR) [Entered: 07/24/2019 10:28 AM]
July 24, 2019 Appellees United States Department of Homeland Security, DOJ and USA verbally granted an extension of time to file brief until 08/21/2019 pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. (ARR) [Entered: 07/24/2019 10:26 AM]
July 17, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz - Pro Se Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 1 (RM) [Entered: 07/18/2019 04:14 PM]
July 15, 2019 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz - Pro Se Brief with Addendum attached. Copies: 4. (RM) [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:52 PM]
July 15, 2019 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz for leave to Lodge Exhibits. Certificate of Service dated 07/15/2019. Service made by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect the correct event] [19-2119]--[Edited 07/16/2019 by EMA] (ML) [Entered: 07/15/2019 12:46 PM]
July 13, 2019 ECF FILER: Appendix Volume I (Documentation required by the Cour per Clerk Order dated 06/20/2019). Court Docket mailed to the Court via USPS. filed by Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz. Certificate of Service dated 07/13/2019. Service made by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect the correct event] [19-2119]--[Edited 07/15/2019 by EMA] (ML) [Entered: 07/13/2019 12:51 PM]
July 8, 2019 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz to seal Opening Brief. Certificate of Service dated 07/08/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2119] (ML) [Entered: 07/08/2019 12:09 PM]
July 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC PRO SE REDACTED BRIEF from Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz, filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/08/2019 by ECF. [Modifier added] [19-2119]--[Edited 07/08/2019 by EMA] (ML) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:59 AM]
July 8, 2019 ECF FILER: SEALED ELECTRONIC PRO SE BRIEF from Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz, filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/08/2019 by ECF. [19-2119] (ML) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:58 AM]
July 8, 2019 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz to File Redacted Opening Brief. Certificate of Service dated 07/08/2019. Service made by ECF. [Entry edited to reflect the correct relief requested] [19-2119]--[Edited 07/08/2019 by EMA] (ML) [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:43 AM]
July 8, 2019 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC PRO SE BRIEF from Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz, filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/08/2019 by ECF. [Appellant is directed to re-file sealed brief, redacted brief and motion separately] [19-2119]--[Edited 07/08/2019 by EMA] (ML) [Entered: 07/08/2019 09:58 AM]
June 20, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Manuel Lampon-Paz due on or before 07/30/2019. Appendix due on or before 07/30/2019. (ARR) [Entered: 06/20/2019 05:33 PM]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) construing the foregoing motion filed by Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz as a motion for leave to proceed on the original record. So construed, the motion is granted provided that the following documents are attached to Appellant's brief at the time the brief is filed: (1) copy of the district court docket entries; (2) the notice of appeal; and (3) the order being appealed and any accompanying memorandum. It is noted that the district court record is available electronically through the electronic case filing system. Should this Court require documents from the district court record while considering Appellant's brief, the Court will be able to access the record, filed. (ARR) [Entered: 06/20/2019 05:31 PM]
June 20, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to John Regina, Esq. for State of New Jersey requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/05/2019. (ARR) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:17 PM]
June 20, 2019 TRANSCRIPT (Clk), unnecessary for appeal purposes. (ARR) [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:16 PM]
June 18, 2019 ECF FILER: MOTION Request Exhibits from District Court filed by Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz. Certificate of Service dated 06/18/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2119]--[Edited 06/20/2019 by ARR] (ML) [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:03 PM]
May 31, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed by Attorney United States Attorney New Jersey (NJ) for Appellees USA, DOJ and United States Department of Homeland Security.. (ARR) [Entered: 05/31/2019 01:44 PM]
May 31, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (ARR) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:29 AM]
May 31, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Manuel Lampon-Paz in District Court No. 2-16-cv-09071. (ARR) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manuel Lampon-Paz v. DOJ, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: United States Attorney New Jersey (NJ)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: John Regina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: United States Attorney New Jersey (NJ)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: United States Attorney New Jersey (NJ)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MANUEL LAMPON-PAZ
Represented By: Manuel Lampon-Paz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?