Stephen Rementer v. Superintendent Benner Township, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY, ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA and SUPERINTENDENT BENNER TOWNSHIP SCI
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEPHEN A. REMENTER
Case Number: 19-2308
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Stephen A. Rementer for Certificate of Appealability. Certificate of Service dated 07/16/2019. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:15 AM]
July 3, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael T. Rakaczewski, Esq. for Attorney General Pennsylvania, District Attorney Monroe County and Superintendent Benner Township SCI requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/17/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 07/03/2019 12:27 PM]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (Clerk) The motion is granted. Appellant's application for a certificate of appealability must be filed on or before August 1, 2019. If Appellant does not file an application for a certificate of appealability by the deadline established, Appellant's notice of appeal will be deemed to be such an application and will be submitted by the Clerk of this Court to a panel of the Court for consideration. See Fed. R. App. P. 22(b)(2), filed. (PDB) [Entered: 07/03/2019 12:20 PM]
June 28, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING: Ronald Eisenberg, Esq. for Attorney General Pennsylvania advises he will not participate in this appeal. (TMM) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:09 PM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Stephen A. Rementer to Extension of Time to File Certificate of Appealability. Certificate of Service dated 06/19/2019. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 06/25/2019 02:47 PM]
June 10, 2019 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (SH) [Entered: 06/10/2019 01:05 PM]
June 6, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Stephen A. Rementer in District Court No. 1-19-cv-00137. (TMM) [Entered: 06/06/2019 12:12 PM]
June 6, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 06/06/2019 12:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Stephen Rementer v. Superintendent Benner Township, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY
Represented By: Michael T. Rakaczewski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Michael T. Rakaczewski Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Eisenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUPERINTENDENT BENNER TOWNSHIP SCI
Represented By: Michael T. Rakaczewski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN A. REMENTER
Represented By: Stephen A. Rementer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?