Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Plaza Square Apartments, et al
Defendant: FRANCES AMMONS, ALYSSA GOLDMAN, TANYA MARRIOTI and MARIA GEMILLIANA DESSI
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO
Defendant / Appellee: PLAZA SQUARE APARTMENTS
Case Number: 19-2719
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 15, 2021 Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Plaza Square Apartments

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Reply to Appellee's Response by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo, filed., Certificate of service dated 08/21/2019. Service made by Email. (JK) [Entered: 08/22/2019 03:12 PM]
August 21, 2019 ECF FILER: RESPONSE on behalf of Appellee Plaza Square Apartments to possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect, filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/21/2019 by ECF, Email. [19-2719]--[Edited 08/21/2019 by JK] (TJB) [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:19 AM]
August 20, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Terrence J. Bolan on behalf of Respondent(s) Highlands Operating Company LLC i/p/a Plaza Square Apartment. [19-2719] (TJB) [Entered: 08/20/2019 08:41 AM]
August 20, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT [19-2719] (TJB) [Entered: 08/20/2019 08:42 AM]
August 16, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Terrence J. Bolan, Esq. for Plaza Square Apartments, Gregory J. Corcoran, Esq. for Maria Gemilliana Dessi and Dale W. Keith, Esq. for Alyssa Goldman and Tanya Marrioti requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/23/2019. (JK) [Entered: 08/16/2019 12:07 PM]
August 16, 2019 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 08/09/2019. (JK) [Entered: 08/16/2019 12:05 PM]
August 13, 2019 LETTER MOTION filed by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo for a formally dated order of the District Court stating the District Court's disposition and/or Opinion as to the Plaintiff's Objections Motion and related submission/request in support of a Sua Ponte order to amending and/or to alter the District Court order under the Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 59(d) or in the alternative, an order for a brief extension of the time to file Notice of Appeal as to order to 07/24/2019 on grounds of excusable neglect. Response due on 08/22/2019. Certificate of Service dated 08/12/2019. Service made by Email. (JK) [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:44 PM]
August 2, 2019 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo to possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect, filed. Certificate of Service dated 07/31/2019. Service made by Email. (JK) [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:09 PM]
July 30, 2019 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (SH) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:57 PM]
July 26, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 07/26/2019 10:57 AM]
July 26, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo in District Court No. 3-17-cv-01068. (JK) [Entered: 07/26/2019 10:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo v. Plaza Square Apartments, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICKY KAMDEM-OUAFFO
Represented By: Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCES AMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALYSSA GOLDMAN
Represented By: Dale W. Keith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TANYA MARRIOTI
Represented By: Dale W. Keith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA GEMILLIANA DESSI
Represented By: Gregory J. Corcoran Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PLAZA SQUARE APARTMENTS
Represented By: Terrence J. Bolan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?