Richard Kaul v. Christopher Christie, et al
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, GEICO CASUALTY CO, LINDY WASHBURN, JOSEPH M. GORRELL, PETER CARMEL, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE CO, GEICO, LEWIS STEIN, Esq., DUGHI HEWIT, BRIAN GRAGNOLATI, RICHARD CRIST, GEICO INDEMNITY CO, BRACH EICHLER LLC, WARREN E. BUFFET, MICHAEL KEATING, FRANK MOORE and BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY
Defendant / Appellee: CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS, SCARINCI & HOLLENBECK, WILLIAM MITCHELL, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, TD BANK, ROBERT HEARY, CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS, KENNETH J. HOLLENBECK, MARC COHEN, ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM, ANDREW KAUFMAN, WILLIAM ROEDER, NORTH AMERICAN SPINE SOCIETY, CHRISTOPHER WOLFA, MD, STEVEN LOMAZOW, GREGORY PRZYBYLSKI, PETER STAATS, MD, MD, HOWARD SOLOMON, ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE CO, DIVESH KOTHARI, JEFFREY S. CHIESA, NORTH JERSEY MEDIA, HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS, BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, RP, JAMES GONZALEZ, RUTGERS SCHOOL OF BIOMEDICAL AND HEALTH SCIENCES, ROBERT GARRETT and THOMAS PETERSON
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, MD
Case Number: 19-3113
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Disclosure Stmnt. Service made on 10/31/2019 by ECF, US mail. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:26 PM]
October 31, 2019 ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Attorney Appearance. Service made on 10/30/2019 by ECF, US mail. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:19 PM]
October 31, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee TD Bank, filed. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:31 PM]
October 30, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William T. Marshall, Jr., Esq., Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP on behalf of Appellee(s) TD Bank, N.A. and Diveyesh Kothari. [19-3113] (WTM) [Entered: 10/30/2019 12:05 PM]
October 21, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Richard Arjun Kaul, MD The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order, filed. (JK) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:57 PM]
October 17, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert J. McGuire on behalf of Appellee(s) Christopher J. Christie, State of New Jersey, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, William Roader, Jeffrey Chiesa, Esq., Lewis Stein, Esq., Howard Solomon, Esq., Steven Lomazow, Gregory Przybylski, and Andrew Kaufman. [19-3113] --[Edited 10/17/2019 by JK] (RJM) [Entered: 10/17/2019 04:56 PM]
October 17, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Geri L. Albin, Esq. for Allstate New Jersey Insurance Co and Richard Crist, David J. D'Aloia, Esq. for Allstate New Jersey Insurance Co and Richard Crist, Charles X. Gormally, Esq. for Joseph M. Gorrell and Brach Eichler LLC, Gene Y. Kang, Esq. for Berkshire Hathaway, Geico General Insurance Co, Geico Indemnity Co, Geico Casualty Co, Warren E. Buffet and Geico, William T. Marshall, Jr., Esq. for TD Bank and Divesh Kothari, Autumn M. McCourt, Esq. for Joseph M. Gorrell and Brach Eichler LLC, Robert J. McGuire, Esq. for Howard Solomon, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, State of New Jersey, Christopher J. Christie, William Roeder, Jeffrey S. Chiesa, Steven Lomazow, Gregory Przybylski and Andrew Kaufman, Kenneth S. Merber, Esq. for Dughi Hewit and Michael Keating, Paul J. Miller, Esq. for American Medical Association and Peter Carmel, Rodney N.T. Richards, Esq. for Frank Moore, John J. Robertelli, Esq. for Berkshire Hathaway, Geico General Insurance Co, Geico Indemnity Co, Geico Casualty Co, Warren E. Buffet and Geico, Edward G. Sponzilli, Esq. for Rutgers School of Biomedical and Health Sciences and Robert Heary, Lewis Stein, Esq. for Lewis Stein, Esq. and Daniel M. Vannella, Esq. for Howard Solomon, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, State of New Jersey, Christopher J. Christie, William Roeder, Jeffrey S. Chiesa, Steven Lomazow, Gregory Przybylski and Andrew Kaufman requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/31/2019. (JK) [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:21 PM]
October 17, 2019 RESPONSE on behalf of Appellant Richard Arjun Kaul, MD to possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. Certificate of Service dated 10/16/2019. Service made by Email. (JK) [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:13 PM]
October 7, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians and Peter Staats, MD, filed. [19-3113] (SMZ) [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:56 AM]
October 2, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah M. Ziolkowski, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) The American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians and Peter S. Staats, M.D.. [19-3113] (SMZ) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:59 PM]
October 1, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Melissa A. Provost on behalf of Appellee(s) James Gonzalez. [19-3113] (MAP) [Entered: 10/01/2019 09:46 AM]
September 30, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Kenneth M. Brown, Esq. for Appellee Atlantic Health System. [-Removed from the Disclosure Statement Entry and correctly separately docketed.] (CJG) [Entered: 10/01/2019 09:18 AM]
September 30, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Atlantic Health System, filed. [19-3113] --[Edited 10/01/2019 by CJGto remove entry of appearance form from entry as it has been separately docketed under its individual event.] (KMB) [Entered: 09/30/2019 04:26 PM]
September 30, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Scarinci & Hollenbeck and Kenneth J. Hollenbeck in 19-3113, Respondents Scarinci & Hollenbeck and Kenneth J. Hollenbeck in 19-2958, filed. [19-3113]--[Edited 10/11/2019 by JK] (MPC) [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:14 AM]
September 30, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael P Chipko on behalf of Appellee(s) Scarinci & Hollenbeck and Kenneth Hollenbeck, Esq.. [19-3113]--[Edited 10/11/2019 by JK] (MPC) [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:12 AM]
September 27, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Respondent Hackensack University Medical Center in 19-2958, filed. [19-3113] --[Edited 09/27/2019 by JK] (MDH) [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:37 PM]
September 27, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Marc D. Haefner on behalf of Respondent(s) Hackensack University Medical Center and Robert Garrett. [19-3113]--[Edited 09/27/2019 by JK] (MDH) [Entered: 09/27/2019 12:35 PM]
September 26, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Edward G. Sponzilli on behalf of Appellee(s) Robert Heary. [19-3113] (EGS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 12:27 PM]
September 25, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Allstate New Jersey Insurance Co, filed. [19-3113] (DJD) [Entered: 09/25/2019 04:45 PM]
September 25, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David J. D'Aloia on behalf of Appellee(s) Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Richard Crist. [19-3113] (DJD) [Entered: 09/25/2019 04:44 PM]
September 25, 2019 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (MW) [Entered: 09/25/2019 03:00 PM]
September 25, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey D. Noonan, Sr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Dr. Thomas Peterson. [19-3113] (JDN) [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:50 PM]
September 25, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Lindy Washburn, filed. on behalf of Appellee North Jersey Media, filed. [19-3113] (TJC) [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:32 PM]
September 25, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas J. Cafferty, Esq., GIBBONS P.C. on behalf of Appellee(s) Fourth Edition Inc. f/k/a North Jersey Media Inc. and Lindy Washburn. [19-3113] (TJC) [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:29 PM]
September 24, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee North American Spine Society, filed. [19-3113] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:57 PM]
September 24, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stewart M. Leviss, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Dr. William Mitchell, Dr. Marc Cohen and North American Spine Society. [19-3113] (SML) [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:53 PM]
September 23, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Richard Arjun Kaul, MD to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 10/03/2019. Certificate of Service dated 09/23/2019. Service made by ECF. (JK) [Entered: 09/23/2019 03:21 PM]
September 23, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 09/23/2019 02:20 PM]
September 23, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Richard Arjun Kaul, MD in District Court No. 2-16-cv-02364. (JK) [Entered: 09/23/2019 02:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Kaul v. Christopher Christie, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Paul J. Miller Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO CASUALTY CO
Represented By: John J. Robertelli Esq.
Represented By: Gene Y. Kang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDY WASHBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH M. GORRELL
Represented By: Autumn M. McCourt Esq.
Represented By: Charles X. Gormally Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER CARMEL
Represented By: Paul J. Miller Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE CO
Represented By: John J. Robertelli Esq.
Represented By: Gene Y. Kang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO
Represented By: John J. Robertelli Esq.
Represented By: Gene Y. Kang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEWIS STEIN, Esq.
Represented By: Lewis Stein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUGHI HEWIT
Represented By: Kenneth S. Merber Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN GRAGNOLATI
Represented By: Kenneth M. Brown Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD CRIST
Represented By: David J. D'Aloia Esq.
Represented By: Geri L. Albin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY CO
Represented By: John J. Robertelli Esq.
Represented By: Gene Y. Kang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRACH EICHLER LLC
Represented By: Autumn M. McCourt Esq.
Represented By: Charles X. Gormally Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN E. BUFFET
Represented By: John J. Robertelli Esq.
Represented By: Gene Y. Kang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL KEATING
Represented By: Kenneth S. Merber Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK MOORE
Represented By: Rodney N.T. Richards Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY
Represented By: John J. Robertelli Esq.
Represented By: Gene Y. Kang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE
Represented By: Robert J. McGuire Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Vannella Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL PAIN PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Sophia A. Perna Esq.
Represented By: David J. Montag Esq.
Represented By: Sarah M. Ziolkowski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCARINCI & HOLLENBECK
Represented By: Michael P. Chipko Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM MITCHELL
Represented By: Stewart M. Leviss Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: Robert J. McGuire Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Vannella Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TD BANK
Represented By: William T. Marshall Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT HEARY
Represented By: Edward G. Sponzilli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONGRESS OF NEUROLOGICAL SURGEONS
Represented By: Alisha L. McCarthy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH J. HOLLENBECK
Represented By: Michael P. Chipko Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARC COHEN
Represented By: Stewart M. Leviss Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATLANTIC HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Kenneth M. Brown Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW KAUFMAN
Represented By: Robert J. McGuire Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Vannella Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM ROEDER
Represented By: Robert J. McGuire Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Vannella Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTH AMERICAN SPINE SOCIETY
Represented By: Stewart M. Leviss Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER WOLFA, MD
Represented By: Alisha L. McCarthy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN LOMAZOW
Represented By: Robert J. McGuire Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Vannella Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY PRZYBYLSKI
Represented By: Robert J. McGuire Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Vannella Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER STAATS, MD, MD
Represented By: David J. Montag Esq.
Represented By: Sarah M. Ziolkowski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOWARD SOLOMON
Represented By: Robert J. McGuire Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Vannella Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLSTATE NEW JERSEY INSURANCE CO
Represented By: David J. D'Aloia Esq.
Represented By: Geri L. Albin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIVESH KOTHARI
Represented By: William T. Marshall Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY S. CHIESA
Represented By: Robert J. McGuire Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Vannella Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTH JERSEY MEDIA
Represented By: Thomas J. Cafferty Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HACKENSACK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Marc D. Haefner Esq.
Represented By: Liza M. Walsh Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEW JERSEY BOARD OF MEDICAL EXAMINERS
Represented By: Robert J. McGuire Esq.
Represented By: Daniel M. Vannella Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, RP
Represented By: John J. Robertelli Esq.
Represented By: Gene Y. Kang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES GONZALEZ
Represented By: Erdal A. Turnacioglu Esq.
Represented By: Melissa A. Provost Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUTGERS SCHOOL OF BIOMEDICAL AND HEALTH SCIENCES
Represented By: Edward G. Sponzilli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT GARRETT
Represented By: Marc D. Haefner Esq.
Represented By: Liza M. Walsh Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS PETERSON
Represented By: Richard Malagiere Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Noonan Esq. Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD ARJUN KAUL, MD
Represented By: Richard Arjun Kaul MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?