G. S., et al v. Penn Trafford School District, et al
Defendant / Appellee: PENN TRAFFORD SCHOOL DISTRICT, GREGORY CAPOCCIONI, SCOTT INGLESE, MATTHEW HARRIS and ANTHONY AQUILIO
Plaintiff / Appellant: G. S., as an individual and mother and natural guardian of and S. S., a minor
Case Number: 19-3309
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants G. S. and S. S. due on or before 01/13/2020. Appendix due on or before 01/13/2020. (PDB) [Entered: 12/04/2019 05:40 PM]
October 25, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:58 PM]
October 25, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gary H. Dadamo on behalf of Appellee(s) Scott Inglese,Matthew Harris, Gregory Capoccioni, Anthony Aquilio. [19-3309] (GHD) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:52 PM]
October 25, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael L. Brungo on behalf of Appellee(s) Matthew Harris. [19-3309] (MLB) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:19 PM]
October 25, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael L. Brungo on behalf of Appellee(s) Gregory Capoccioni. [19-3309] (MLB) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:17 PM]
October 25, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael L. Brungo on behalf of Appellee(s) Anthony Aquilio. [19-3309] (MLB) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:15 PM]
October 25, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael L. Brungo on behalf of Appellee(s) Penn Trafford School District. [19-3309] (MLB) [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:52 PM]
October 25, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gary H. Dadamo on behalf of Appellee(s) Penn Trafford School District. [19-3309] (GHD) [Entered: 10/25/2019 10:56 AM]
October 23, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants G. S. and S. S. advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-3309] (AHL) [Entered: 10/23/2019 10:28 AM]
October 23, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants G. S. and S. S., received. [19-3309] (AHL) [Entered: 10/23/2019 10:25 AM]
October 23, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants G. S. and S. S., filed. [19-3309] (AHL) [Entered: 10/23/2019 10:22 AM]
October 23, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexander H. Lindsay, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) G.S. and S.S.. [19-3309] (AHL) [Entered: 10/23/2019 10:19 AM]
October 10, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 10/10/2019 06:08 PM]
October 10, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants G. S. and S. S. in District Court No. 2-18-cv-00204. (PDB) [Entered: 10/10/2019 06:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G. S., et al v. Penn Trafford School District, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PENN TRAFFORD SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Gary H. Dadamo Esq.
Represented By: Michael L. Brungo Esq.
Represented By: Roger W. Foley Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY CAPOCCIONI
Represented By: Gary H. Dadamo Esq.
Represented By: Michael L. Brungo Esq.
Represented By: Roger W. Foley Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT INGLESE
Represented By: Gary H. Dadamo Esq.
Represented By: Michael L. Brungo Esq.
Represented By: Roger W. Foley Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW HARRIS
Represented By: Gary H. Dadamo Esq.
Represented By: Michael L. Brungo Esq.
Represented By: Roger W. Foley Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY AQUILIO
Represented By: Gary H. Dadamo Esq.
Represented By: Michael L. Brungo Esq.
Represented By: Roger W. Foley Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: G. S., as an individual and mother and natural guardian of
Represented By: Alexander H. Lindsay Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: S. S., a minor
Represented By: Alexander H. Lindsay Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?