Patrick Gaitens, et al v. US Dept of Veterans Affairs, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: YVONNE GAITENS and PATRICK GAITENS
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Case Number: 19-3475
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 16, 2020 Patrick Gaitens v. US Dept of Veterans Affairs

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 12/03/2019 01:03 PM]
December 2, 2019 TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) the briefing and scheduling order that was previously entered is hereby vacated. The case will be returned to the Circuit Mediator for possible settlement. In the event that mediation is not sucessful, a new briefing and scheduling order will be issued. (PD) [Entered: 12/02/2019 04:32 PM]
November 21, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Patrick Gaitens and Yvonne Gaitens due on or before 12/31/2019. Appendix due on or before 12/31/2019. [-VACATED Per Clerk's Order entered 12/2/19.]--[Edited 12/03/2019 by CJG] (CJG) [Entered: 11/21/2019 03:16 PM]
November 20, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Carly Hudson on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America, US Dept of Veteran's Affairs. [19-3475] (CAH) [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:53 PM]
November 20, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dylan J. Steinberg on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America and US Dept. of Veterans Affairs. [19-3475] (DJS) [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:50 PM]
November 15, 2019 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Carly A. Hudson, Esq. and Dylan J. Steinberg, Esq. for USA and United States Department of Veterans Affairs requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/29/2019. (CJG) [Entered: 11/15/2019 02:35 PM]
November 5, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Francis J. Murphy and Jonathan L. Parshall on behalf of Appellant(s) Patrick Gaitens and Yvonne Gaitens. [19-3475] (FJM) [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:46 PM]
November 5, 2019 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Patrick Gaitens and Yvonne Gaitens advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-3475] (FJM) [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:43 PM]
November 5, 2019 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Patrick Gaitens and Yvonne Gaitens, received. [19-3475] (FJM) [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:42 PM]
November 5, 2019 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Patrick Gaitens and Yvonne Gaitens, filed. [19-3475] (FJM) [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:39 PM]
November 5, 2019 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Patrick Gaitens and Yvonne Gaitens, filed. [19-3475] (FJM) [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:37 PM]
October 29, 2019 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 10/29/2019. (CJG) [Entered: 10/29/2019 03:02 PM]
October 28, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 10/28/2019 03:49 PM]
October 28, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Patrick Gaitens and Yvonne Gaitens in District Court No. 1-18-cv-01011. (CJG) [Entered: 10/28/2019 03:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Patrick Gaitens, et al v. US Dept of Veterans Affairs, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YVONNE GAITENS
Represented By: Francis J. Murphy Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICK GAITENS
Represented By: Francis J. Murphy Esq.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Carly A. Hudson Esq.
Represented By: Dylan J. Steinberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Represented By: Carly A. Hudson Esq.
Represented By: Dylan J. Steinberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?