Shawn Freemore v. Superintendent Houtzdale SCI, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY, ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA and SUPERINTENDENT HOUTZDALE SCI
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHAWN FREEMORE
Case Number: 20-1069
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Attorney General Pennsylvania, District Attorney Monroe County and Superintendent Houtzdale SCI to motion for certificate of appealability. Certificate of Service dated 02/28/2020. [20-1069] (MSM) [Entered: 02/28/2020 09:13 AM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION filed by Appellant Shawn Freemore for Certificate of Appealability. Response due on 03/05/2020. Certificate of Service dated 02/20/2020. Service made by US mail. (MB) [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:58 PM]
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 COPY OF OPINION/ORDER OF DISTRICT COURT dated 02/13/2020 signed by Malachy E. Mannion, US District Judge ORDERED that Petitioner's motion for reconsideration of the Court's December 2, 2019, Memorandum and Order dismissing Petitioner's habeas corpus action as untimely is denied. (MB) [Entered: 02/18/2020 07:50 AM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT received from Appellant Shawn Freemore. (MB) [Entered: 02/20/2020 04:35 PM]
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark S. Matthews, Esq. on behalf of Respondent(s) Superintendent Houtzdale, Pennsylvania Attorney General, Monroe County District Attorney. [20-1069] (MSM) [Entered: 02/10/2020 01:30 PM]
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Shawn Freemore. (MB) [Entered: 01/31/2020 10:57 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Ronald Eisenberg, Esq. for Attorney General Pennsylvania and Mark S. Matthews, Esq. for District Attorney Monroe County requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/13/2020. (MB) [Entered: 01/30/2020 09:31 AM]
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION filed by Appellant Shawn Freemore to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 02/03/2020. Certificate of Service dated 01/21/2020. Service made by US mail. (MB) [Entered: 01/28/2020 09:48 AM]
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK ORDER - RULE 4(a)(4) staying case pending disposition of post decision motion(s). (MB) [Entered: 01/13/2020 07:58 AM]
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (NF) [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:45 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 01/09/2020 11:55 AM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Shawn Freemore in District Court No. 3-18-cv-01465. (MB) [Entered: 01/09/2020 11:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Shawn Freemore v. Superintendent Houtzdale SCI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY
Represented By: Mark S. Matthews Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Ronald Eisenberg Esq.
Represented By: Mark S. Matthews Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUPERINTENDENT HOUTZDALE SCI
Represented By: Mark S. Matthews Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHAWN FREEMORE
Represented By: Shawn Freemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?