Assem Abulkhair v. FBI, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, FORMER DIRECTOR IN HIS OFFICIALL CAPACITY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, JAMES B. COMEY, JR., CURRENT DIRECTOR IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY, AARON T. FORD, SPECIAL AGENT IN CHARGE OF THE FBI'S NEWARK DIVISION IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff / Appellant: ASSEM A. ABULKHAIR
Case Number: 20-1695
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Assem A. Abulkhair for Appointment of Counsel. Response due on 05/07/2020. Certificate of Service dated 04/22/2020. Service made by Clerk's Office. (SLC) [Entered: 04/22/2020 07:16 AM]
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Allan B.K. Urgent, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) FBI, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, FORMER DIRECTOR IN HIS OFFICIALL CAPACITY, JAMES B. COMEY, JR.,CURRENT DIRECTOR IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY, AARON T. FORD, SPECIAL AGENT IN CHARGE OF THE FBI'S NEWARK DIVISION IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY and USA. [20-1695] (AU) [Entered: 04/02/2020 12:06 PM]
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Andrew Ruymann, Chief, Civil Division on behalf of Appellee(s) FBI, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, FORMER DIRECTOR IN HIS OFFICIALL CAPACITY, JAMES B. COMEY, JR.,CURRENT DIRECTOR IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY, AARON T. FORD, SPECIAL AGENT IN CHARGE OF THE FBI'S NEWARK DIVISION IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY and USA. [20-1695] (JAR) [Entered: 04/02/2020 12:00 PM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 04/01/2020 08:52 AM]
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Assem A. Abulkhair in District Court No. 2-14-cv-05677. (SLC) [Entered: 04/01/2020 08:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Assem Abulkhair v. FBI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, FORMER DIRECTOR IN HIS OFFICIALL CAPACITY
Represented By: Allan Urgent Esq.
Represented By: J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: Allan Urgent Esq.
Represented By: J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES B. COMEY, JR., CURRENT DIRECTOR IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY
Represented By: Allan Urgent Esq.
Represented By: J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AARON T. FORD, SPECIAL AGENT IN CHARGE OF THE FBI'S NEWARK DIVISION IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY
Represented By: Allan Urgent Esq.
Represented By: J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Allan Urgent Esq.
Represented By: J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ASSEM A. ABULKHAIR
Represented By: Assem A. Abulkhair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?