PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fu, et al v. BT Group PLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: NICK ROSE, GAVIN E. PATTERSON, RICHARD CAMERON, LUIS ALVAREZ, BT GROUP PLC, IAN LIVINGSTON and TONY CHANMUGAM
Plaintiff / Appellant: CLAYTON HOLLISTER and PAMCAH-AU LOCAL 675 PENSION FUND
Case Number: 20-2106
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 06/17/2020. (CJG) [Entered: 07/01/2020 01:38 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Clayton Hollister and PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fund advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:57 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Clayton Hollister. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:55 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fund. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:54 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fund and Clayton Hollister. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:52 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Clayton Hollister and PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fund. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:51 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Douglas Wilens on behalf of Appellant(s) PAMCAH-UA Local 675 Pension Fund and Clayton Hollister. [20-2106] (DSW) [Entered: 06/16/2020 03:50 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee BT Group PLC. [20-2106] (JDT) [Entered: 06/16/2020 01:44 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John D. Tortorella on behalf of Appellee(s) BT Group plc; Ian Livingston; Gavin E. Patterson; Tony Chanmugam; Nick Rose; Luis Alvarez; Richard Cameron. [20-2106] (JDT) [Entered: 06/16/2020 01:42 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kevin H. Marino on behalf of Appellee(s) BT Group plc; Ian Livingston; Gavin E. Patterson; Tony Chanmugam; Nick Rose; Luis Alvarez; Richard Cameron. [20-2106] (KHM) [Entered: 06/16/2020 01:40 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from MARI BYRNE on behalf of Appellee(s) BT GROUP PLC; IAN LIVINGSTON; GAVIN E. PATTERSON; TONY CHANMUGAM; NICK ROSE; LUIS ALVAREZ; RICHARD CAMERON. [20-2106] (MB) [Entered: 06/16/2020 01:33 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from JAMES P. ROUHANDEH on behalf of Appellee(s) BT GROUP PLC; IAN LIVINGSTON; GAVIN E. PATTERSON; TONY CHANMUGAM; NICK ROSE; LUIS ALVAREZ; RICHARD CAMERON. [20-2106] (JPR) [Entered: 06/16/2020 01:28 PM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 06/02/2020 11:24 AM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Clayton Hollister in District Court No. 2-17-cv-00497. (CJG) [Entered: 06/02/2020 11:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: PAMCAH-AU Local 675 Pension Fu, et al v. BT Group PLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICK ROSE
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein Esq.
Represented By: Kevin H. Marino Esq.
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh Esq.
Represented By: John D. Tortorella Esq.
Represented By: Mari Byrne Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GAVIN E. PATTERSON
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein Esq.
Represented By: Kevin H. Marino Esq.
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh Esq.
Represented By: John D. Tortorella Esq.
Represented By: Mari Byrne Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD CAMERON
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein Esq.
Represented By: Kevin H. Marino Esq.
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh Esq.
Represented By: John D. Tortorella Esq.
Represented By: Mari Byrne Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUIS ALVAREZ
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein Esq.
Represented By: Kevin H. Marino Esq.
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh Esq.
Represented By: John D. Tortorella Esq.
Represented By: Mari Byrne Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BT GROUP PLC
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein Esq.
Represented By: Kevin H. Marino Esq.
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh Esq.
Represented By: John D. Tortorella Esq.
Represented By: Mari Byrne Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IAN LIVINGSTON
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein Esq.
Represented By: Kevin H. Marino Esq.
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh Esq.
Represented By: John D. Tortorella Esq.
Represented By: Mari Byrne Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY CHANMUGAM
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein Esq.
Represented By: Kevin H. Marino Esq.
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh Esq.
Represented By: John D. Tortorella Esq.
Represented By: Mari Byrne Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLAYTON HOLLISTER
Represented By: Corey Holzer Esq.
Represented By: James E. Cecchi Esq.
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman Esq.
Represented By: Donald A. Ecklund Esq.
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld Esq.
Represented By: Alan I. Ellman Esq.
Represented By: Marshall P. Dees Esq.
Represented By: Douglas S. Wilens Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAMCAH-AU LOCAL 675 PENSION FUND
Represented By: Corey Holzer Esq.
Represented By: James E. Cecchi Esq.
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman Esq.
Represented By: Donald A. Ecklund Esq.
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld Esq.
Represented By: Alan I. Ellman Esq.
Represented By: Marshall P. Dees Esq.
Represented By: Douglas S. Wilens Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?