Justin Corliss v. Superintendent Coal Township S, et al
Defendant: SUPERINTENDENT COAL TOWNSHIP SCI
Defendant / Appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY
Plaintiff / Appellant: JUSTIN M. CORLISS
Case Number: 20-2778
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael Rakaczewski, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. [20-2778] (MSM) [Entered: 10/26/2020 12:35 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 SECOND FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael T. Rakaczewski, Esq. for District Attorney Monroe County requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/29/2020. (CJG) [Entered: 10/15/2020 11:15 AM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael T. Rakaczewski, Esq. for District Attorney Monroe County requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 09/30/2020. (CJG) [Entered: 09/16/2020 07:54 AM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (SH) [Entered: 09/04/2020 02:27 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATING: Sean A. Kirkpatrick, Esq. for Superintendent Coal Township SCI will not participate in this appeal, received. [20-2778] (SAK) [Entered: 09/04/2020 12:16 PM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Justin M. Corliss for Certificate of Appealability. Response, if any, due on 09/11/2020. (CJG) [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:31 AM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:31 AM]
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Justin M. Corliss in District Court No. 1-18-cv-02192. (CJG) [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Justin Corliss v. Superintendent Coal Township S, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY
Represented By: Michael T. Rakaczewski Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUSTIN M. CORLISS
Represented By: Justin M. Corliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERINTENDENT COAL TOWNSHIP SCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?