Jose Montanez v. Superintendent Huntingdon SCI, et al
Respondent / Appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY PHILADELPHIA, ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA and SUPERINTENDENT HUNTINGDON SCI
Petitioner / Appellant: JOSE MONTANEZ
Case Number: 20-3090
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Clerk) No action will be taken on the foregoing motion for stay insofar as a briefing schedule has not been issued in this matter, and therefore, the motion is unnecessary. It is noted that Appellant filed an application for a certificate of appealability on November 20, 2020. If the Court grants the application for a certificate of appealability, the Clerk will enter an order setting a deadline for Appellant to file his brief and appendix. (CND) [Entered: 11/25/2020 04:39 PM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION filed by Appellant Jose Montanez for Certificate of Appealability. Response due on 11/30/2020. Certificate of Service dated 11/16/2020. Service made by US mail. (CND) [Entered: 11/24/2020 07:54 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Appellant Jose Montanez for a Stay of Proceedings. Response due on 11/09/2020. Certificate of Service dated 10/26/2020. Service made by US mail. (CND) [Entered: 11/03/2020 10:56 AM]
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (JW) [Entered: 10/27/2020 04:13 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION filed by Appellant Jose Montanez for Extension of Time to File Brief treated as Motion for Extension of Time to File Request for Certificate of Appealability. Response due on 10/22/2020. Certificate of Service dated 10/09/2020. Service made by US mail. (CND) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:37 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samuel H. Ritterman on behalf of Appellee(s) Supt. Huntingdon SCI; District Attorney of the County of Philadelphia; Attorney General of the State of Pennsylvania. [20-3090] (SHR) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:22 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CND) [Entered: 10/15/2020 07:15 AM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jose Montanez in District Court No. 2-19-cv-02970. (CND) [Entered: 10/15/2020 07:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jose Montanez v. Superintendent Huntingdon SCI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: Samuel H. Ritterman Esq.
Represented By: Banafsheh Amirzadeh Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Ronald Eisenberg Esq.
Represented By: Samuel H. Ritterman Esq.
Represented By: Banafsheh Amirzadeh Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SUPERINTENDENT HUNTINGDON SCI
Represented By: Samuel H. Ritterman Esq.
Represented By: Banafsheh Amirzadeh Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JOSE MONTANEZ
Represented By: Jose Montanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?