Administrator Ad Prosequendum v. Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp, et al
Defendant: 5 SEASONS LSB CORP, ABC CORP 1-10 and JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Plaintiff / Appellee: ADMINISTRATOR AD PROSEQUENDUM FOR THE ESTATE OF WILLIAMS SARAVIA
Defendant / Appellee: PATRIOT CONTRACT SERVICES LLC, ABC CORP 1-10, (fictitious individuals, corporations or other business entities presently unidentifiable) and JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, (fictitious unidentified individuals)
Defendant / Appellant: BAYONNE DRY DOCK & REPAIR CORP
Case Number: 20-3257
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 21 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Patriot Contract Services LLC. on behalf of Appellee Patriot Contract Services LLC in 20-3257.--[Edited 12/22/2020 by MB] (CN) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:52 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christopher Nucifora on behalf of Appellee(s) Patriot Contract Services, LLC. [20-3257]--[Edited 12/22/2020 by MB] (CN) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:49 PM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 19 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Patriot Contract Services, LLC. on behalf of Appellant Patriot Contract Services LLC in 20-3334. [20-3334, 20-3257] (Document deleted due to corrected filing on 11/21/200--[Edited 12/22/2020 by MB] (CN) [Entered: 12/18/2020 03:34 PM]
December 4, 2020 Filing 17 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Gino A. Zonghetti, Esq. for Patriot Contract Services LLC in 20-3257, 20-3334 requesting the following documents: Appearance Form on or before 12/18/2020. Disclosure Statement on or before 12/18/2020. [20-3257, 20-3334] (DW) [Entered: 12/04/2020 09:51 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Attorney James E. Mercante updated his attorney status on 11/25/2020on behalf of Appellant Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp. Received on 11/25/2020. (DW) [Entered: 11/30/2020 08:22 AM]
November 25, 2020 Filing 15 Attorney Bar status modified for James E. Mercante, Esq. for Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp in 20-3257. Status is now active. [20-3257, 20-3334] (TMK) [Entered: 11/27/2020 11:16 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney James E. Mercante, Esq. for Appellant Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp in 20-3257. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 12/08/2020. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. [20-3257, 20-3334] (TMK) [Entered: 11/24/2020 11:09 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellant Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp. Attorney James E. Mercante to update attorney admissions status. Compliance due 11/27/2020. [20-3257, 20-3334] (DW) [Entered: 11/23/2020 07:48 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Attorneys Stern and Mercante submitted separate entry of appearances received from Appellant Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp. (DW) [Entered: 11/23/2020 07:40 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael E. Stern on behalf of Appellant(s) Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp.. [20-3257] (MES) [Entered: 11/23/2020 05:16 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James E. Mercante on behalf of Appellant(s) Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair. [20-3257, 20-3334] (JEM) [Entered: 11/23/2020 04:30 PM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) [Entered: 11/20/2020 09:24 PM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 ECF FILER :ENTRY of Appearance from Attorney Richard M. Winograd, Esq. for Appellee Administrator Ad Prosequendum for the Estate of Williams Saravia in 20-3257, 20-3334 Certificate of Service dated 11/20/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3257, 20-3334]--[Edited 11/20/2020 by DW] (RMW) [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:56 AM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK ORDER The appeals are consolidated for purposes of scheduling, joint appendix, Appellee's brief, and disposition. Appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. Appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). [20-3257, 20-3334] (DW) [Entered: 11/19/2020 02:40 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellant Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp requesting that a separate entry of appearance form be filed for each attorney and listed on the docket as separate entries. Compliance due 11/23/2020. (DW) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:31 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT [20-3257] (JEM) [Entered: 11/18/2020 04:00 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp. [20-3257] (JEM) [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:59 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp. [20-3257] (JEM) [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:57 PM]
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James E. Mercante and Michael E. Stern. on behalf of Appellant(s) Bayonne Dry Dock. [20-3257] (JEM) [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:56 PM]
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp in District Court No. 2-20-cv-09174. (DW) [Entered: 11/05/2020 11:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Administrator Ad Prosequendum v. Bayonne Dry Dock & Repair Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 SEASONS LSB CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ADMINISTRATOR AD PROSEQUENDUM FOR THE ESTATE OF WILLIAMS SARAVIA
Represented By: Richard M. Winograd Esq.
Represented By: Sean Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRIOT CONTRACT SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Gino A. Zonghetti Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Nucifora Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABC CORP 1-10, (fictitious individuals, corporations or other business entities presently unidentifiable)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, (fictitious unidentified individuals)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BAYONNE DRY DOCK & REPAIR CORP
Represented By: Michael E. Stern Esq.
Represented By: James E. Mercante Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?