Cigar Association of America, et al v. City of Philadelphia, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: CIGAR ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA INC, SWEDISH MATCH NORTH AMERICA LLC, SWISHER INTERNATIONAL INC and ITG CIGARS INC
Defendant / Appellant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA and COMMISSIONER PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH
Case Number: 20-3519
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants City of Philadelphia and Commissioner Philadelphia Department of Public Health due on or before 02/17/2021. Appendix due on or before 02/17/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 01/08/2021 04:07 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 13 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Swisher International Inc. [20-3519] (JSS) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:12 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee ITG Cigars Inc. [20-3519] (JSS) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:11 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 11 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Cigar Association of America Inc. [20-3519] (JSS) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:11 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew M. Erdlen on behalf of Appellee(s) Cigar Association of America, Inc., ITG Cigars, Inc., Swisher International, Inc., and Swedish Match North America, LLC. [20-3519] (AME) [Entered: 12/29/2020 03:54 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John S. Summers on behalf of Appellee(s) Cigar Association of America, Inc., ITG Cigars, Inc., Swisher International, Inc., and Swedish Match North America, LLC. [20-3519] (JSS) [Entered: 12/29/2020 03:52 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark A. Aronchick on behalf of Appellee(s) Cigar Association of America, Inc., ITG Cigars, Inc., Swisher International, Inc., and Swedish Match North America, LLC. [20-3519] (MAA) [Entered: 12/29/2020 03:46 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants City of Philadelphia and Commissioner Philadelphia Department of Public Health advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. KATHLEEN FELDMAN, CSR, CRR, RPR, CM. [20-3519] (KSD) [Entered: 12/28/2020 01:17 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kelly Diffily on behalf of Appellant(s) CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PUBLIC HEALTH COMMISSIONER THOMAS FARLEY. [20-3519] (KSD) [Entered: 12/28/2020 01:02 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants City of Philadelphia and Commissioner Philadelphia Department of Public Health. [20-3519] (KSD) [Entered: 12/28/2020 12:55 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants City of Philadelphia and Commissioner Philadelphia Department of Public Health. [20-3519] (KSD) [Entered: 12/28/2020 12:55 PM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 12/15/2020. (CJG) [Entered: 12/16/2020 02:00 PM]
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AR) [Entered: 12/15/2020 11:35 AM]
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants City of Philadelphia and Commissioner Philadelphia Department of Public Health in District Court No. 2-20-cv-03220. (AR) [Entered: 12/15/2020 11:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cigar Association of America, et al v. City of Philadelphia, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CIGAR ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA INC
Represented By: Mark A. Aronchick Esq.
Represented By: Andrew M. Erdlen Esq.
Represented By: John S. Summers Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SWEDISH MATCH NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Aronchick Esq.
Represented By: Andrew M. Erdlen Esq.
Represented By: John S. Summers Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SWISHER INTERNATIONAL INC
Represented By: Mark A. Aronchick Esq.
Represented By: Andrew M. Erdlen Esq.
Represented By: John S. Summers Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ITG CIGARS INC
Represented By: Mark A. Aronchick Esq.
Represented By: Andrew M. Erdlen Esq.
Represented By: John S. Summers Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: Danielle E. Walsh Esq.
Represented By: Kelly S. Diffily Esq.
Represented By: Diana P. Cortes Esq.
Represented By: Eleanor N. Ewing Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin H. Field Esq.
Represented By: Richard G. Feder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COMMISSIONER PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH
Represented By: Danielle E. Walsh Esq.
Represented By: Kelly S. Diffily Esq.
Represented By: Diana P. Cortes Esq.
Represented By: Eleanor N. Ewing Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin H. Field Esq.
Represented By: Richard G. Feder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?