Victor Walthour v. City of Philadelphia, et al
Defendant / Appellee: LINDA K. HOBKIRK, JOHN W. HERRON, PAUL FELDMAN, PNC BANK and CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Plaintiff / Appellant: VICTOR WALTHOUR
Case Number: 20-3544
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 26, 2021 Victor Walthour v. City of Philadelphia

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 ECF FILER: LETTER on behalf of Appellee Paul Feldman. Appellee Paul Feldman will adopt the Motion to Pause Briefing Schedule and for Summary Affirmance filed by Defendant City of Philadelphia on behalf of Appellee City of Philadelphia. Certificate of Service dated 02/10/2021.Service made by ECF, US mail. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL if/when applicable. [20-3544] (DEW) [Entered: 02/10/2021 03:04 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 11 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee City of Philadelphia to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction, to stay briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 02/09/2021. Service made by ECF. [20-3544] (ZGS) [Entered: 02/09/2021 04:30 PM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Victor Walthour due on or before 03/16/2021. Appendix due on or before 03/16/2021. (SLC) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:16 AM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 01/05/2021. (SLC) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:11 AM]
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Zachary Strassburger, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) City of Philadelphia. [20-3544] (ZGS) [Entered: 12/22/2020 04:01 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Martha Gale, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Senior Judge John W. Herron. [20-3544] (MG) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:15 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee PNC Bank. [20-3544] (SV) [Entered: 12/21/2020 03:46 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Susan Verbonitz, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) PNC Bank, National Association. [20-3544] (SV) [Entered: 12/21/2020 03:43 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Susan Verbonitz, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Defendant PNC Bank, National Association. [20-3544] (SV) [Entered: 12/21/2020 02:42 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dean E. Weisgold, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Paul Feldman. [20-3544] (DEW) [Entered: 12/21/2020 12:45 PM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 12/17/2020 03:02 PM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Victor Walthour in District Court No. 2-20-cv-00068. (AMR) [Entered: 12/17/2020 02:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Victor Walthour v. City of Philadelphia, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINDA K. HOBKIRK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN W. HERRON
Represented By: Martha Gale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL FELDMAN
Represented By: Dean E. Weisgold Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PNC BANK
Represented By: Susan Verbonitz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: Sean J. McGrath Esq.
Represented By: Zachary G. Strassburger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICTOR WALTHOUR
Represented By: Victor Walthour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?