Allen Farmer v. Gary M. Lanigan, et al
Defendant / Appellee: BRIAN RIORDAN, F. MARTIN, CAPTAIN ALPHONSO, ABU AHSAN, LIEUTENANT BENITO, CAROL GALLAGHER, GARY M. LANIGAN, DOCTOR ADKINS, R. VALENTINE and RAPP
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALLEN J. FARMER
Case Number: 20-3549
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to pay the filing fee for the notice of appeal. Case terminated on 01/08/2021. (CLW) [Entered: 01/08/2021 04:51 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Margaret Raymond-Flood, Esq. for Appellees Abu Ahsan, Carol Gallagher and Rapp Letter explaining the reasons for not filing a Notice of Appearance in this matter.. Certificate of Service dated 01/07/2021. Service made by ECF, US mail. [20-3549] (MR) [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:33 AM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kevin J. Dronson, Esq. for Gary M. Lanigan, Moshood Muftau, Esq. for Brian Riordan, Alphonso and Benito and Margaret Raymond-Flood, Esq. for Abu Ahsan, Carol Gallagher and Rapp requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/19/2021. (CLW) [Entered: 01/05/2021 10:27 AM]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Clerk) To facilitate electronic filing for a larger groups of parties represented by the same attorney, the first named party in each group will be the designated filer, as follows; For all parties represented by Kevin John Dronson, Esq. or any other attorney from the New Jersey Ofice of the Attorney General, the designated filer shall be Gary M. Lanigan. Counsel is advised that the designated filed is for cm/ecf fiing purposes only. Names of all represented parties must be listed on all forms, motions and briefs. Attorneys representing smaller groups of parties must select all inidividual persons or entities as filers in cm/ecf. (CLW) [Entered: 12/17/2020 10:30 AM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 12/17/2020 09:45 AM]
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Allen J. Farmer in District Court No. 2-12-cv-05716. (CLW) [Entered: 12/17/2020 09:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Allen Farmer v. Gary M. Lanigan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN RIORDAN
Represented By: Moshood Muftau Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: F. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPTAIN ALPHONSO
Represented By: Moshood Muftau Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABU AHSAN
Represented By: Margaret Raymond-Flood Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIEUTENANT BENITO
Represented By: Moshood Muftau Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL GALLAGHER
Represented By: Margaret Raymond-Flood Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY M. LANIGAN
Represented By: Kevin J. Dronson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOCTOR ADKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. VALENTINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAPP
Represented By: Margaret Raymond-Flood Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALLEN J. FARMER
Represented By: Allen J. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?