Daniel Warren v. Prime Care Medical Inc, et al
Defendant: THOMAS C. CREIGHTON, III, LISA SCHELLER, COUNTY OF LEHIGH, CAROL SOMMERS, TOM MULLER, JANINE DONATE, PERCY DOUGHERTY, CINDY EGIZIO, BRAD OSBORNE, JENNIFER SANCHEZ, KURT STAMETZ, DAVID S. JONES, GEOFF BRACE, MICHAEL SCHWARE, VIC MAZZIOTTI, EDWARD SWEENEY and AMANDA HOLT
Defendant / Appellee: DEBORAH WILSON, CARL HOFFMAN, JR., REBECCA F. DAVIS, PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC and DANIEL R. HOFFMAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: DANIEL WARREN
Case Number: 20-3561
Filed: December 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 17 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 02/05/2021 03:51 PM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 16 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel Warren. [20-3561] (DN) [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:39 PM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 15 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Jasmeet K. Ahuja, Esq. for Mr. Daniel Warren, Jessica K. Jacobs, Esq. for Mr. Daniel Warren and David Newmann, Esq. for Mr. Daniel Warren requesting the following document(s): Concise Summary on or before 02/03/2021. (PDB) [Entered: 01/20/2021 11:50 AM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 14 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Thomas M. Caffrey, Esq. for Cindy Egizio, County of Lehigh, Edward Sweeney, Janine Donate, Tom Muller, Thomas C. Creighton, III, David S. Jones, Michael Schware, Amanda Holt, Vic Mazziotti, Lisa Scheller, Brad Osborne, Geoff Brace, Percy Dougherty, Carol Sommers, Jennifer Sanchez and Kurt Stametz requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/03/2021. (PDB) [Entered: 01/20/2021 11:35 AM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Rebecca F. Davis, Carl Hoffman, Jr., Daniel R. Hoffman, Prime Care Medical Inc and Deborah Wilson to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 01/07/2021. [20-3561] (JRN) [Entered: 01/07/2021 02:58 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John R. Ninosky on behalf of Appellee(s) Rebecca Davis. [20-3561] (JRN) [Entered: 01/07/2021 02:53 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel Warren to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 01/07/2021. [20-3561] (DN) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:31 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Mr. Daniel Warren. [20-3561] (DN) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:30 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jasmeet K. Ahuja on behalf of Appellant(s) Daniel Warren. [20-3561] (JKA) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:27 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jessica K. Jacobs on behalf of Appellant(s) Daniel Warren. [20-3561] (JKJ) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:25 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David Newmann on behalf of Appellant(s) Daniel Warren. [20-3561] (DN) [Entered: 01/07/2021 12:23 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Prime Care Medical Inc. [20-3561] (JRN) [Entered: 12/28/2020 10:01 AM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John R. Ninosky on behalf of Appellee(s) PrimeCare Medical, Inc., Carl Hoffman, Jr., Rebecca F. Davis, Deborah Wilson, Daniel Hoffman. [20-3561] (JRN) [Entered: 12/28/2020 10:00 AM]
December 24, 2020 Filing 4 Certified copy of duplicate notice of appeal filed in the district court on 12/17/2020 received from Clerk of District Court. (PDB) [Entered: 12/24/2020 05:03 PM]
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Clerk) advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (PDB) [Entered: 12/24/2020 05:02 PM]
December 24, 2020 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 12/24/2020 04:55 PM]
December 24, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Daniel Warren in District Court No. 5-16-cv-00643. (PDB) [Entered: 12/24/2020 04:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Daniel Warren v. Prime Care Medical Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS C. CREIGHTON, III
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA SCHELLER
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF LEHIGH
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROL SOMMERS
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM MULLER
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANINE DONATE
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERCY DOUGHERTY
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINDY EGIZIO
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD OSBORNE
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER SANCHEZ
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KURT STAMETZ
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID S. JONES
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOFF BRACE
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SCHWARE
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIC MAZZIOTTI
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD SWEENEY
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA HOLT
Represented By: Thomas M. Caffrey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBORAH WILSON
Represented By: John R. Ninosky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL HOFFMAN, JR.
Represented By: John R. Ninosky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REBECCA F. DAVIS
Represented By: John R. Ninosky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRIME CARE MEDICAL INC
Represented By: John R. Ninosky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL R. HOFFMAN
Represented By: John R. Ninosky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL WARREN
Represented By: David Newmann Esq.
Represented By: Jessica K. Jacobs Esq.
Represented By: Jasmeet K. Ahuja Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?