Huguette Young v. Attorney General Delaware
Defendant / Appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL DELAWARE
Plaintiff / Appellant: HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG
Case Number: 21-1206
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to pay the filing fee for the notice of appeal. Case terminated on 03/24/2021. (CLW) [Entered: 03/24/2021 05:30 PM]
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Attorney General Delaware to Legal Division letter advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 03/16/2021. [21-1206] (RTC) [Entered: 03/16/2021 01:59 PM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ryan T. Costa on behalf of Appellee(s) Attorney General Delaware. [21-1206] (RTC) [Entered: 02/25/2021 03:15 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (NF) [Entered: 02/23/2021 06:12 PM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:06 AM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young in District Court No. 1-20-cv-01383. (AMR) [Entered: 02/04/2021 09:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Huguette Young v. Attorney General Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL DELAWARE
Represented By: Attorney General Delaware
Represented By: Ryan T. Costa Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG
Represented By: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?