Barry Cohen v. Jeff Horn, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JEFF J. HORN and HORN LAW GROUP LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: BARRY COHEN
Case Number: 21-1223
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 INFORMAL BRIEF with Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Barry Cohen. Pages: 6, Certificate of Service dated 03/18/2021 by US mail. (SJB) [Entered: 03/22/2021 01:01 PM]
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Barry Cohen due on or before 03/22/2021. Appendix due on or before 03/22/2021. (SB) [Entered: 02/08/2021 04:41 PM]
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey S. Leonard, Esq. on behalf of Respondent(s) Jeff J. Horn, Esq. and The Horn Law Group. [21-1223] (JSL) [Entered: 02/08/2021 12:47 PM]
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Horn Law Group LLC. [21-1223] (MKS) [Entered: 02/08/2021 11:37 AM]
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Meredith Kaplan Stoma, Esq on behalf of Respondent(s) Jeff J. Horn, Esq. and The Horn Law Group. [21-1223] (MKS) [Entered: 02/08/2021 10:56 AM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:50 PM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Barry Cohen in District Court No. 3-19-cv-05604. (AMR) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Barry Cohen v. Jeff Horn, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFF J. HORN
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Leonard Esq.
Represented By: Meredith K. Stoma Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HORN LAW GROUP LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Leonard Esq.
Represented By: Meredith K. Stoma Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BARRY COHEN
Represented By: Barry Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?