Berkley Specialty Insurance Co v. Masterforce Construction Corp, et al
Defendant: WE DO METAL ROOFS, KEITH R. WILTON and ROBERT DEHARDER
Plaintiff / Appellee: BERKLEY SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO, f/k/a Berkley Regional Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant / Appellant: JOHN P. BRANDT, O.D. and KAREN BRANDT
Defendant / Appellee: MASTERFORCE CONSTRUCTION CORP
Case Number: 21-1287
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 03/29/2021 10:13 AM]
March 26, 2021 Filing 13 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Masterforce Construction Corp. [21-1287] (PDB) [Entered: 03/26/2021 09:59 AM]
March 26, 2021 Filing 12 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Phillip D. Berger on behalf of Respondent(s) Masterforce Construction Corp.. [21-1287] (PDB) [Entered: 03/26/2021 09:58 AM]
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Karen Brandt and John P. Brandt advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-1287] (RFE) [Entered: 03/23/2021 12:42 PM]
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants John P. Brandt and Karen Brandt. [21-1287] (RFE) [Entered: 03/23/2021 12:41 PM]
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants John P. Brandt and Karen Brandt. [21-1287] (RFE) [Entered: 03/23/2021 12:39 PM]
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants John P. Brandt and Karen Brandt. [21-1287] (RFE) [Entered: 03/23/2021 12:38 PM]
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert Englert on behalf of Appellant(s) John P. Brandt, O.D., Karen Brandt. [21-1287] (RFE) [Entered: 03/23/2021 12:37 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Berkley Specialty Insurance Co. [21-1287] (ALM) [Entered: 03/10/2021 03:25 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Anthony L. Miscioscia, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Berkley Specialty Insurance Company. [21-1287] (ALM) [Entered: 03/10/2021 03:21 PM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Phillip D. Berger, Esq. for Masterforce Construction Corp, Konrad Krebs, Esq. for Berkley Specialty Insurance Co and Anthony L. Miscioscia, Esq. for Berkley Specialty Insurance Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/23/2021. Disclosure Statement on or before 03/23/2021. (MB) [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:30 AM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Jessalyn L. Cool, Esq. for John P. Brandt and Karen Brandt and Robert F. Englert, Esq. for John P. Brandt and Karen Brandt requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/23/2021. Disclosure Statement on or before 03/23/2021. Information Statement on or before 03/23/2021. Concise Summary on or before 03/23/2021. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 03/23/2021. (MB) [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:25 AM]
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:49 AM]
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants John P. Brandt and Karen Brandt in District Court No. 4-19-cv-01162. (AMR) [Entered: 02/18/2021 09:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Berkley Specialty Insurance Co v. Masterforce Construction Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BERKLEY SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO, f/k/a Berkley Regional Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Konrad Krebs Esq.
Represented By: Anthony L. Miscioscia Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN P. BRANDT, O.D.
Represented By: Jessalyn L. Cool Esq.
Represented By: Robert F. Englert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KAREN BRANDT
Represented By: Jessalyn L. Cool Esq.
Represented By: Robert F. Englert Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WE DO METAL ROOFS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH R. WILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT DEHARDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MASTERFORCE CONSTRUCTION CORP
Represented By: Phillip D. Berger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?