Shawn Freemore v. Superintendent Houtzdale SCI, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY, ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA and SUPERINTENDENT HOUTZDALE SCI
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHAWN FREEMORE
Case Number: 21-1927
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION filed by Appellant Shawn Freemore for Continuation of In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 06/26/2021. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 07/08/2021 11:07 AM]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Clerk) The motion for continuation of in forma pauperis status on appeal is denied as presented. Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3) allows a party to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal without further authorization if the party "was permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in the district-court action." As Appellant was not granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the underlying District Court action, he may not automatically proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Action on the motion to motion to proceed in forma pauperis received on May 19, 2021 is again deferred. As previoulsly advised by way of the May 25, 2021 Clerk's Order, an affidavit of poverty and 6-month prison account statement are required before the Court can take action of the motion. Accordingly, Appellant must submit an affidavit of poverty and 6-month prison account statement within 14 days of the date of this Order. (TMM) [Entered: 06/22/2021 10:26 AM]
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION filed by Appellant Shawn Freemore for Continuation of In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Certificate of Service dated 05/30/2021. Service made by US mail.--[Edited 06/22/2021 by TMM] (TMM) [Entered: 06/15/2021 10:51 AM]
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Clerk) Action on the motion to proceed in forma pauperis is deferred pending the submission of additional documents. Appellant must submit an affidavit of poverty and 6 month prison account statement within 14 days of the date of this order. (TMM) [Entered: 05/25/2021 07:54 AM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION filed by Appellant Shawn Freemore to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Certificate of Service dated 05/16/2021. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:59 PM]
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (SH) [Entered: 05/13/2021 01:28 PM]
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION filed by Appellant Shawn Freemore for Certificate of Appealability. Certificate of Service dated 05/05/2021. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 05/12/2021 10:59 AM]
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 05/11/2021 09:50 AM]
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Shawn Freemore in District Court No. 3-18-cv-01465. (TMM) [Entered: 05/11/2021 09:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Shawn Freemore v. Superintendent Houtzdale SCI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY MONROE COUNTY
Represented By: Mark S. Matthews Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Ronald Eisenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUPERINTENDENT HOUTZDALE SCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHAWN FREEMORE
Represented By: Shawn Freemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?