Tyrone Shepherd v. Anne Marie Coyle
Plaintiff / Appellant: TYRONE SHEPHERD
Defendant / Appellee: ANNE MARIE B. COYLE, The Honorable Judge of the Court of Common Pleas
Case Number: 21-2266
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to pay the filing fee for the notice of appeal. Case terminated on 09/09/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 09/09/2021 12:12 PM]
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert J. Krandel, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Hon. Anne Marie Coyle. [21-2266] (RJK) [Entered: 08/03/2021 10:18 AM]
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Robert J. Krandel, Esq. for Anne Marie B. Coyle requesting Appearance Form on or before 08/03/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 07/20/2021 02:06 PM]
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 07/01/2021 04:32 PM]
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Tyrone Shepherd in District Court No. 2-21-cv-01591. (CJG) [Entered: 07/01/2021 04:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tyrone Shepherd v. Anne Marie Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TYRONE SHEPHERD
Represented By: Tyrone Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANNE MARIE B. COYLE, The Honorable Judge of the Court of Common Pleas
Represented By: Robert J. Krandel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?