Rabah Rabah v. Warden Bergen County Correctional Center, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: RABAH KHALED RABAH
Defendant / Appellant: WARDEN BERGEN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Case Number: 22-1592
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (PDB) [Entered: 05/24/2022 05:06 PM]
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 ECF FILER: Stipulation to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) filed by Appellant Warden Bergen County Correctional Center without costs. Certificate of Service dated 05/24/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-1592] (ML) [Entered: 05/24/2022 03:20 PM]
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Warden Bergen County Correctional Center due on or before 06/06/2022. Appendix due on or before 06/06/2022. (PDB) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:21 PM]
April 25, 2022 Filing 6 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Warden Bergen County Correctional Center. [22-1592] (ML) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:09 PM]
April 25, 2022 Filing 5 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mary Larakers, Esq. for Warden Bergen County Correctional Center requesting the following document(s): Information Statement on or before 05/09/2022. (PDB) [Entered: 04/25/2022 10:49 AM]
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Craig Relles, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Rabah Rabah. [22-1592] (CR) [Entered: 04/25/2022 10:23 AM]
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mary Larakers on behalf of Appellant(s) Warden Bergen County Correctional Center. [22-1592] (ML) [Entered: 04/12/2022 01:51 PM]
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 04/04/2022 11:55 AM]
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Warden Bergen County Correctional Center in District Court No. 2-21-cv-10707. (PDB) [Entered: 04/04/2022 11:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rabah Rabah v. Warden Bergen County Correctional Center, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RABAH KHALED RABAH
Represented By: Steven A. Ashur Esq.
Represented By: Craig Relles Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WARDEN BERGEN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Represented By: William C. Peachey Esq.
Represented By: Elianis N. Perez Esq.
Represented By: Mary Larakers Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?