Chestnut Street Consolidated LLC v. Bahaa Dawara, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: CHESTNUT STREET CONSOLIDATED LLC
Defendant / Appellant: BAHAA DAWARA, IMAD DAWARA, FATAN DAWARA, aka Faten Dawara, MAISAA DAWARA, MIRVAT DAWARA, ABEER NAIM and HITHAM ALBAROUKI, aka Haitham Albarouki
Case Number: 22-3283
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Filing 11 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gary F. Seitz on behalf of Appellee(s) Chestnut Street Consolidated LLC. [22-3283] (GFS) [Entered: 01/20/2023 09:05 AM]
January 18, 2023 Filing 10 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Gary F. Seitz, Esq. for Chestnut Street Consolidated LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/01/2023. (PDB) [Entered: 01/18/2023 08:28 PM]
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Court Reporter Mike Finney directing transcripts, ordered on 12/16/2022 , to be filed by 01/18/2023. (PDB) [Entered: 12/16/2022 12:13 PM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 8 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Hitham Albarouki, Bahaa Dawara, Fatan Dawara, Imad Dawara, Maisaa Dawara, Mirvat Dawara and Abeer Naim advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: 11/9/22, to be filed by [22-3283] (MBW) [Entered: 12/16/2022 11:28 AM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 7 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Hitham Albarouki, Bahaa Dawara, Fatan Dawara, Imad Dawara, Maisaa Dawara, Mirvat Dawara and Abeer Naim. [22-3283] (MBW) [Entered: 12/16/2022 11:25 AM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 6 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Hitham Albarouki, Bahaa Dawara, Fatan Dawara, Imad Dawara, Maisaa Dawara, Mirvat Dawara and Abeer Naim. [22-3283] (MBW) [Entered: 12/16/2022 11:24 AM]
December 16, 2022 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew B. Weisberg on behalf of Appellant(s) Bahaa Dawara, Imad Dawara, Fatan Dawara, Maisaa Dawara, Mirvat Dawara, Abeer Naim, and Hitham Albarouki. [22-3283] (MBW) [Entered: 12/16/2022 11:17 AM]
December 14, 2022 Filing 4 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 12/13/2022. (KR) [Entered: 12/14/2022 09:17 AM]
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Clerk) advising that it appears it would not be appropriate to list the case for possible dismissal. The appeals at 22-2615 and 22-3283 are consolidated for all purposes. [22-2615, 22-3283] (TNH) [Entered: 12/02/2022 01:21 PM]
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TNH) [Entered: 12/02/2022 01:00 PM]
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Hitham Albarouki, Bahaa Dawara, Fatan Dawara, Imad Dawara, Maisaa Dawara, Mirvat Dawara and Abeer Naim in District Court No. 2-21-cv-03046. (TNH) [Entered: 12/02/2022 12:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Chestnut Street Consolidated LLC v. Bahaa Dawara, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHESTNUT STREET CONSOLIDATED LLC
Represented By: Gary F. Seitz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BAHAA DAWARA
Represented By: Eileen T. Burns Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Weisberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: IMAD DAWARA
Represented By: Eileen T. Burns Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Weisberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FATAN DAWARA, aka Faten Dawara
Represented By: Jonathan J. Sobel Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Weisberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MAISAA DAWARA
Represented By: Jonathan J. Sobel Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Weisberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MIRVAT DAWARA
Represented By: Jonathan J. Sobel Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Weisberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ABEER NAIM
Represented By: Jonathan J. Sobel Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Weisberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HITHAM ALBAROUKI, aka Haitham Albarouki
Represented By: Jonathan J. Sobel Esq.
Represented By: Matthew B. Weisberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?