Tysheim Murphy v. Attorney General New Jersey, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: TYSHEIM MURPHY
Defendant / Appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL NEW JERSEY and ADMINISTRATOR EAST JERSEY STATE PRISON
Case Number: 22-3420
Filed: December 23, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Filing 7 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Tysheim Murphy. (KR) [Entered: 02/10/2023 04:42 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Appellant Tysheim Murphy for Certificate of Appealability. Response due on 02/21/2023. Certificate of Service dated 02/10/2023. Service made by ECF. (KR) [Entered: 02/10/2023 04:37 PM]
January 9, 2023 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John J. Santoliquido on behalf of Appellee(s) Attorney General of New Jersey; Patrick Nogan, Warden. [22-3420] (JJS) [Entered: 01/09/2023 01:19 PM]
January 9, 2023 Filing 4 FOLLOW UP LETTER to John J. Santoliquido, Esq. for Attorney General New Jersey and Administrator East Jersey State Prison requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 01/23/2023. (KR) [Entered: 01/09/2023 11:15 AM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 3 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (JW) [Entered: 12/29/2022 11:37 AM]
December 23, 2022 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 12/23/2022 08:29 AM]
December 23, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Tysheim Murphy in District Court No. 1-17-cv-02960. (KR) [Entered: 12/23/2022 08:16 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tysheim Murphy v. Attorney General New Jersey, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TYSHEIM MURPHY
Represented By: Tysheim Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL NEW JERSEY
Represented By: John J. Santoliquido Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADMINISTRATOR EAST JERSEY STATE PRISON
Represented By: John J. Santoliquido Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?