Hong Zhuang v. EMD Performance Materials Corp
Plaintiff / Appellant: HONG ZHUANG
Defendant / Appellee: EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP
Case Number: 23-1401
Filed: March 15, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights Employment
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2023 Filing 17 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee EMD Performance Materials Corp - Brief (FILED UNDER SEAL). Copies: 7. (KEL) [Entered: 05/10/2023 12:01 PM]
May 8, 2023 Filing 16 ECF FILER: SEALED ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee EMD Performance Materials Corp. Certificate of Service dated 05/08/2023 by ECF, Email. [23-1401][Changed event]--[Edited 05/10/2023 by MCW] (DFH) [Entered: 05/08/2023 11:07 PM]
May 8, 2023 Filing 15 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee EMD Performance Materials Corp to seal Appellee's Brief. Certificate of Service dated 05/08/2023. Service made by ECF, Email. [23-1401] (DFH) [Entered: 05/08/2023 11:05 PM]
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing Motion is referred to the merits panel. The Clerk will hold Appellant's brief and the appendix provisionally under seal pending a ruling by the Court. (MCW) [Entered: 04/28/2023 05:04 PM]
April 10, 2023 Filing 13 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Hong Zhuang - Pro Se Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 1 (MS) [Entered: 04/10/2023 04:06 PM]
April 10, 2023 Filing 12 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Hong Zhuang - INFORMAL Brief. Copies: 7. (SJB) [Entered: 04/10/2023 03:57 PM]
April 10, 2023 Filing 11 COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Motion for leave to file Brief and Appendix Under Seal received from Appellant Hong Zhuang. Received on 04/08/2023. (MCW) [Entered: 04/10/2023 10:52 AM]
April 8, 2023 Filing 10 ECF FILER: SEALED MOTION for leave to file Brief and Appendix Under Seal filed by Appellant Hong Zhuang. Certificate of Service dated 04/08/2023. Service made by ECF, Email. [23-1401][Changed event][SEND TO MERITS PANEL]--[Edited 04/28/2023 by MCW] (HZ) [Entered: 04/08/2023 08:56 PM]
April 6, 2023 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Hong Zhuang, Pro Se Appellant, to file a Motion for leave to file the Brief and Appendix Under Seal with a Certificate of Service attached. Due on or before 04/10/2023 (MCW) [Entered: 04/06/2023 04:29 PM]
April 6, 2023 Filing 8 ECF FILER: SEALED ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Hong Zhuang. Certificate of Service dated 04/06/2023 by ECF, Email. [23-1401] (HZ) [Entered: 04/06/2023 10:54 AM]
April 6, 2023 Filing 7 ECF FILER: SEALED ELECTRONIC PRO SE BRIEF from Appellant Hong Zhuang. Certificate of Service dated 04/06/2023 by Email. [23-1401][Edited docket text]--[Edited 04/06/2023 by MCW] (HZ) [Entered: 04/06/2023 10:28 AM]
March 30, 2023 Filing 6 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee EMD Performance Materials Corp. [23-1401] (DFH) [Entered: 03/30/2023 04:28 PM]
March 29, 2023 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniella Gordon on behalf of Appellee(s) EMD Performance Materials Corp.. [23-1401] (DFH) [Entered: 03/29/2023 04:39 PM]
March 29, 2023 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David F. Herman on behalf of Appellee(s) EMD Performance Materials Corp.. [23-1401] (DFH) [Entered: 03/29/2023 04:37 PM]
March 21, 2023 Filing 3 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Hong Zhuang due on or before 05/01/2023. Appendix due on or before 05/01/2023. (KR) [Entered: 03/21/2023 01:44 PM]
March 15, 2023 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 03/15/2023 01:33 PM]
March 15, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Hong Zhuang in District Court No. 1-18-cv-001432. (KR) [Entered: 03/15/2023 01:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Hong Zhuang v. EMD Performance Materials Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HONG ZHUANG
Represented By: Hong Zhuang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMD PERFORMANCE MATERIALS CORP
Represented By: Daniella Gordon Esq.
Represented By: David F. Herman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?