James Boykins v. Gary Lanigan, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAMES BOYKINS
Defendant / Appellee: GARY M. LANIGAN, Commissioner of New Jersey Department of Corrections, In his Individual and Official Capacity
Case Number: 23-1477
Filed: March 22, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to pay the filing fee for the notice of appeal. Case terminated on 05/04/2023. (DW) [Entered: 05/04/2023 04:43 PM]
April 12, 2023 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from KATHERINE ELLEN CHRISMAN on behalf of Appellee(s) GARY LANIGAN, STEPHEN JOHNSON, ANTONIO CAMPOS, MARCUS HICKS, RASOUL SULUKI, G. KELLY, D. SMITH, SERGEANT SAMOSUK, K. MCEADY, K. WICKHAM, C. LAWRENCE, S. MCDONOUGH, J. BROWN.. [23-1477] (KEC) [Entered: 04/12/2023 10:24 AM]
April 11, 2023 Filing 5 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Gregory R. Bueno, Esq. for Gary M. Lanigan and Marcus O. Hicks, Esq., Stephen Johnson, G. Kelly, K. Mceady, Samosuk, K. Wickham and C. Lawrence, Thomas W. Carter for Gary M. Lanigan and Antonio Campos, D. Smith, Marcus O. Hicks, Esq., Stephen Johnson, Rasoul Suluki, G. Kelly, K. Mceady, Samosuk, K. Wickham, C. Lawrence, S. McDonough and J. Brown and Michael Vomacka, Esq. for Gary M. Lanigan and Antonio Campos, D. Smith, Marcus O. Hicks, Esq., Stephen Johnson, Rasoul Suluki, G. Kelly, K. Mceady, Samosuk, K. Wickham, C. Lawrence, S. McDonough and J. Brown requesting the following document: Appearance Form on or before 04/25/2023. (DW) [Entered: 04/11/2023 01:58 PM]
April 11, 2023 Filing 4 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mr. James Boykins requesting the following document(s):1) Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, 2) affidavit of poverty with addendum (form enclosed), 3) authorization for withdrawal of funds (form enclosed), 4) a prison account statement for the 6 month period prior to the filing of the notice of appeal. If you do not pay the docketing fees in the amount of $505.00 in the district court or file the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with all necessary forms in this Court within fourteen (14) days, your case will be dismissed without further notice. 3rd Cir. LAR Misc. 107. (DW) [Entered: 04/11/2023 01:36 PM]
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Clerk) for all parties represented by New Jersey Office of the Attorney General , Esq. the designated filer shall be Gary M. Lanigan. Counsel is advised that the designated filer is for cm/ecf filing purposes only. Names of all represented parties must be listed on all forms, motions and briefs. Attorneys representing smaller groups of parties must select all individual persons or entities as filers in cm/ecf. (DW) [Entered: 03/22/2023 09:59 AM]
March 22, 2023 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) [Entered: 03/22/2023 09:48 AM]
March 22, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. James Boykins in District Court No. 3-15-cv-07769. (DW) [Entered: 03/22/2023 09:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Boykins v. Gary Lanigan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES BOYKINS
Represented By: James Boykins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY M. LANIGAN, Commissioner of New Jersey Department of Corrections, In his Individual and Official Capacity
Represented By: Gregory R. Bueno Esq.
Represented By: Thomas W. Carter
Represented By: Michael Vomacka Esq.
Represented By: Thomas W. Carter Esq.
Represented By: Katherine E. Chrisman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?