Gartor Brown v. Maxwell, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: GARTOR KIKI BROWN
Defendant / Appellee: LT. MAXWELL, C.O. PLOCINIK, CO JOHNSON and CO FOCHTMAN
Case Number: 23-1480
Filed: March 17, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION filed by Appellant Gartor Kiki Brown for Extension of Time to Pay Fee or File Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 05/22/2023. Certificate of Service dated 05/12/2023. Service made by ECF. (DW) [Entered: 05/12/2023 05:41 PM]
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion is granted. Appellant must either pay to the district court the entire docketing and filing fee of $505.00 or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, along with an addendum to the affidavit in support of the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, a completed form authorizing assessments to be made from his prison account, and a certified prison account statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Should Appellant fail to either pay the fees or file the motion within the time stated, she will face dismissal of the appeal pursuant to Third Circuit LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1 without further notice. (DW) [Entered: 05/02/2023 04:10 PM]
May 1, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION filed by Appellant Gartor Kiki Brown titled: " Motion to Consult With The Court" construed as a Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Accompanying Documents. Response due on 05/01/2023. Certificate of Service dated 04/18/2023. Service made by US mail. (DW) [Entered: 05/02/2023 12:41 PM]
April 24, 2023 Filing 7 RETURNED MAIL. Copy of Letter address to Peter J. Welsh, Clerk of the Court sent to Appellant Gartor Kiki Brown. Mail was returned marked: "Return to sender, no longer here, No forwarding address is available." (DW) [Entered: 04/24/2023 05:36 PM]
April 19, 2023 Filing 6 RETURNED MAIL. U.S. Postal Service returned letter [ # 5 ] sent to Appellant Gartor Kiki Brown. Mail was returned marked: "Returned to Sender, No longer here, refused, unable to forward." No forwarding address is available. No information on DOC website. The deadlines originally set will remain in effect. (DW) [Entered: 04/19/2023 04:55 PM]
April 11, 2023 Filing 5 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Gartor Kiki Brown requesting the following document(s):.1) Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, 2) affidavit of poverty with addendum (form enclosed), 3) authorization for withdrawal of funds (form enclosed), 4) a prison account statement for the 6 month period prior to the filing of the notice of appeal. If you do not pay the docketing fees or file the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with all necessary forms within fourteen (14) days, your case will be dismissed without further notice. 3rd Cir. LAR Misc. 107. (DW) [Entered: 04/11/2023 12:54 PM]
March 20, 2023 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kim Adams on behalf of Appellee(s) Maxwell, Plocinik, Johnson (Johnston), Fochtman. [23-1480] (KAA) [Entered: 03/20/2023 09:33 AM]
March 20, 2023 Filing 3 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lindsey A. Bedell on behalf of Appellee(s) Maxwell, Plocinik, Johnson (Johnston), Fochtman. [23-1480] (LAB) [Entered: 03/20/2023 09:25 AM]
March 17, 2023 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) [Entered: 03/17/2023 02:19 PM]
March 17, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Gartor Kiki Brown in District Court No. 3-18-cv-01527. (DW) [Entered: 03/17/2023 01:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gartor Brown v. Maxwell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARTOR KIKI BROWN
Represented By: Gartor Kiki Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LT. MAXWELL
Represented By: Kimberly A. Adams Esq.
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell Esq.
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C.O. PLOCINIK
Represented By: Kimberly A. Adams Esq.
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell Esq.
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CO JOHNSON
Represented By: Kimberly A. Adams Esq.
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell Esq.
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CO FOCHTMAN
Represented By: Kimberly A. Adams Esq.
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell Esq.
Represented By: Caleb C. Enerson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?