Monica Zortea v. Costco Wholesale Corp
Plaintiff / Appellee: MONICA ZORTEA, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellant: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP
Case Number: 23-1955
Filed: May 25, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 10, 2023 Summary Monica Zortea v. Costco Wholesale Corp

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Filing 37 JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellants. [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960] (JK) [Entered: 07/10/2023 05:36 PM]
July 10, 2023 Filing 36 PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: SHWARTZ, RESTREPO and CHUNG, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 20. Judge: SHWARTZ Authoring. [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960]--[Edited 07/10/2023 by JK] (JK) [Entered: 07/10/2023 05:25 PM]
July 10, 2023 Filing 35 SUBMITTED on Monday, July 10, 2023. Panel: SHWARTZ, RESTREPO and CHUNG, Circuit Judges. [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960] (AR) [Entered: 07/10/2023 08:40 AM]
July 10, 2023 Filing 34 COURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [22-1809, 22-2212, 22-3032, 22-3138, 23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960] (AR) [Entered: 07/10/2023 08:37 AM]
June 21, 2023 Filing 33 Submit Notification for Monday, 07/10/2023. [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960] (AR) [Entered: 06/21/2023 11:09 AM]
June 12, 2023 Filing 32 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Costco Wholesale Corp - Reply Brief. Copies: 7. (TMS) [Entered: 06/13/2023 09:20 AM]
June 12, 2023 Filing 31 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Costco Wholesale Corp. Certificate of Service dated 06/12/2023 by ECF, Email. [23-1955] (JGP) [Entered: 06/12/2023 10:57 AM]
June 6, 2023 Filing 30 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Kyle T. McGee, Esq. for Appellant Helen of Troy Ltd in 23-1960. Certificate of Service dated 06/06/2023. Service made by ECF. [23-1960, 23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955] (KTM) [Entered: 06/06/2023 10:23 PM]
June 6, 2023 Filing 29 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney James Moon, Esq. for Appellant Costco Wholesale Corp in 23-1955. Certificate of Service dated 06/06/2023. Service made by ECF. [23-1955, 23-1941] (JM) [Entered: 06/06/2023 02:17 PM]
June 6, 2023 Filing 28 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Cara Rowland in 23-1940, 23-1960, Appellee Monica Zortea in 23-1941, 23-1955 - Brief. Copies: 7. [Parties edited to reflect correctly] [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960]--[Edited 06/06/2023 by EMA] (TMS) [Entered: 06/06/2023 01:54 PM]
June 5, 2023 Filing 27 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Cara Rowland in 23-1940, 23-1960, Appellee Monica Zortea in 23-1941, 23-1955. Certificate of Service dated 06/05/2023 by ECF. [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960] - [Entry edited by the Clerk to reflect the correct event]--[Edited 06/05/2023 by MS] (EJK) [Entered: 06/05/2023 11:55 AM]
June 1, 2023 Filing 26 ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Edwin J. Kilpela, Jr., Esq. for Appellee Cara Rowland in 23-1940, Attorney Edwin J. Kilpela, Jr., Esq. for Appellee Monica Zortea in 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960 re: Attorney Unavailability. Certificate of Service dated 06/01/2023. Service made by ECF. [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960] (EJK) [Entered: 06/01/2023 05:20 PM]
June 1, 2023 Filing 25 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James M. LaMarca on behalf of Appellee(s) Cara Rowland and Monica Zortea. [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960] (JL) [Entered: 06/01/2023 04:10 PM]
June 1, 2023 Filing 24 HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Costco Wholesale Corp - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. (SJB) [Entered: 06/01/2023 03:09 PM]
June 1, 2023 Filing 23 ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Edwin J. Kilpela, Jr., Esq. for Appellee Cara Rowland in 23-1940, Attorney Edwin J. Kilpela, Jr., Esq. for Appellee Monica Zortea in 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960. Certificate of Service dated 06/01/2023. Service made by ECF. [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960] (EJK) [Entered: 06/01/2023 11:38 AM]
May 30, 2023 Filing 22 Attorney Bar status modified for John G. Papianou, Esq. for Costco Wholesale Corp. Status is now active. (TMK) [Entered: 05/30/2023 03:54 PM]
May 30, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney John G. Papianou, Esq. for Appellant Costco Wholesale Corp. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 06/13/2023. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. (TMK) [Entered: 05/30/2023 01:15 PM]
May 30, 2023 Filing 20 Calendared for Monday, 07/10/2023. Calendar Clerk: AR. [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960] (AR) [Entered: 05/30/2023 11:57 AM]
May 26, 2023 Filing 19 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Costco Wholesale Corp. Certificate of service dated 05/26/2023 by US mail, ECF, Email. [23-1955] - [Entry has been removed from 23-1941 by the Clerk]--[Edited 05/26/2023 by MS] (JGP) [Entered: 05/26/2023 11:37 AM]
May 26, 2023 Filing 18 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Costco Wholesale Corp. Certificate of service dated 05/26/2023 by US mail, ECF, Email. [23-1955] - [ [Entry has been removed from 23-1941 by the Clerk]--[Edited 05/26/2023 by MS] (JGP) [Entered: 05/26/2023 11:34 AM]
May 26, 2023 Filing 17 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Costco Wholesale Corp. Certificate of Service dated 05/26/2023 by US mail, ECF, Email. [23-1955] - [Entry has been removed from 23-1941 by the Clerk]--[Edited 05/26/2023 by MS] (JGP) [Entered: 05/26/2023 11:31 AM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 14 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Devin M. Misour on behalf of Appellant(s) Samsung Electronics America Inc.. [23-1941, 23-1940, 23-1955, 23-1960] (DMM) [Entered: 05/25/2023 04:46 PM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 13 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from S. Wesley Gorman on behalf of Appellant(s) Samsung Electronics America Inc.. [23-1941, 23-1940, 23-1955, 23-1960] (SWG) [Entered: 05/25/2023 04:37 PM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 12 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael A. Comber on behalf of Appellant(s) Samsung Electronics America Inc.. [23-1941, 23-1940, 23-1955, 23-1960] (MAC) [Entered: 05/25/2023 04:31 PM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 11 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kyle T. McGee on behalf of Appellant(s) Helen of Troy LTD., a/k/a Helen of Troy L.P., d/b/a Hot Tools Professional. [23-1960, 23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955] (EEM) [Entered: 05/25/2023 04:05 PM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 10 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Caleah N. Whitten on behalf of Appellant(s) Costco Wholesale Corp.. [23-1955] (CW) [Entered: 05/25/2023 03:56 PM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 9 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Peter K. Bae on behalf of Appellant(s) Costco Wholesale Corp.. [23-1955] (KPB) [Entered: 05/25/2023 03:50 PM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James H. Moon on behalf of Appellant(s) Costco Wholesale Corp.. [23-1955] (JM) [Entered: 05/25/2023 03:47 PM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Emily E. Mahler on behalf of Appellant(s) Helen of Troy LTD., a/k/a Helen of Troy L.P., d/b/a Hot Tools Professional. [23-1960, 23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955] (EEM) [Entered: 05/25/2023 03:10 PM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Edwin J. Kilpela, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Monica Zortea. [23-1955] (EJK) [Entered: 05/25/2023 03:05 PM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James Howard on behalf of Appellant(s) Costco Wholesale Corp.. [23-1955, 23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1960] (JEH) [Entered: 05/25/2023 02:44 PM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John G. Papianou on behalf of Appellant(s) Costco Wholesale Corp.. [23-1955, 23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1960] (JGP) [Entered: 05/25/2023 02:33 PM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 3 CLERK ORDER, The appeals at Nos. 23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, and 23-1960 are hereby consolidated for purposes of scheduling and disposition. In accordance with the Court's order entered May 15, 2023, in Nos. 23-8009, 23-8010, 23-8011, and 23-8012, Appellants' opening briefs and joint appendices shall be filed on or before 12:00 noon on May 26, 2023; Appellees' briefs shall be filed on or before 12:00 noon on June 5, 2023; and Appellants' reply briefs shall be filed on or before 12:00 noon on June 12, 2023. The parties are encouraged to file consolidated briefs, adopt arguments by reference, or join in another brief to the extent possible to reduce the possibility of repetitive briefs. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). Briefing extensions will not be entertained absent an agreement from the parties to extend the sixty (60) day deadline. See 28 U.S.C. Section: 1453(c)(2) & (3). The briefs, appendices, and any required forms or motions must only be filed on the general docket numbers. The appeals will be scheduled for disposition during the week of July 10, 2023. The Court will advise the parties whether the case will be called for argument on a later date; however, counsel should plan to be available. [23-1940, 23-1941, 23-1955, 23-1960] (JK) [Entered: 05/25/2023 11:16 AM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 05/25/2023 10:10 AM]
May 25, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Costco Wholesale Corp in District Court No. 2-22-cv-01316. Transferred from Misc. No. 23-8009. (JK) [Entered: 05/25/2023 10:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Monica Zortea v. Costco Wholesale Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MONICA ZORTEA, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Kevin J. Abramowicz Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth A. Held Esq.
Represented By: Edwin J. Kilpela Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie Moore Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Pollock-Avery Esq.
Represented By: Chandler Steiger Esq.
Represented By: Kevin W. Tucker Esq.
Represented By: James LaMarca Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP
Represented By: Kihyun P. Bae Esq.
Represented By: James E. Howard Esq.
Represented By: James Moon Esq.
Represented By: John G. Papianou Esq.
Represented By: Leah A. Tedford Esq.
Represented By: Caleah Whitten Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?