Frank Byrne, Jr. v. Berks County Jail System, et al
Plaintiff: FRANK JAMES BYRNE, JR.
Defendant: BERKS COUNTY JAIL SYSTEM, C/O NEIF, B.C.J.S PRIME CARE and NURSE SHANNON
Case Number: 24-1193
Filed: February 2, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 31, 2024 Frank Byrne, Jr. v. Berks County Jail System

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2024 Filing 10 RETURNED MAIL. U.S. Postal Service returned clerk order dated 03/12/24 [ # 9 ] sent to Appellant Frank James Byrne, Jr.. Mail was returned because Person no longer confined at Berks County Prison. The address has been updated and mail resent. The deadlines set forth originally are extended by 21 days. (KR) [Entered: 03/27/2024 10:28 AM]
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Frank James Byrne, Jr.. The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order. (KR) [Entered: 03/12/2024 03:45 PM]
March 7, 2024 Filing 8 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Frank James Byrne, Jr.. (KR) [Entered: 03/08/2024 04:43 PM]
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Frank James Byrne, Jr.. (KR) [Entered: 03/08/2024 04:43 PM]
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Frank James Byrne, Jr.. (KR) [Entered: 03/08/2024 04:42 PM]
March 7, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION filed by Appellant Frank James Byrne, Jr. to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (KR) [Entered: 03/08/2024 04:41 PM]
February 5, 2024 Filing 4 Duplicate notice of appeal filed in the district court on 01/31/2024 received from Clerk of District Court. (KR) [Entered: 02/05/2024 02:36 PM]
February 2, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR) [Entered: 02/02/2024 08:35 AM]
February 2, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 02/02/2024 08:35 AM]
February 2, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Frank James Byrne, Jr. in District Court No. 5-23-cv-05071. (KR) [Entered: 02/02/2024 08:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frank Byrne, Jr. v. Berks County Jail System, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK JAMES BYRNE, JR.
Represented By: Frank James Byrne Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERKS COUNTY JAIL SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O NEIF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.C.J.S PRIME CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE SHANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?