USA v. One 1962 Aero Twin Commander 500B, Tail No. N37CK,
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ONE 1962 AERO TWIN COMMANDER 500B, TAIL NO. N37CK, SERIAL NO. 500A-1251-76
Claimant: RUSSELL ROBINSON
Case Number: 24-1277
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Oth Forfeiture and Penalty Suits

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 3, 2025 USA v. One 1962 Aero Twin Commander 500B, Tail No. N37CK,

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2024 Filing 14 Appellee USA verbally granted an extension of time to file brief until 05/10/2024 pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 31.4. (LMR) [Entered: 04/04/2024 12:12 PM]
March 26, 2024 Filing 13 PRO SE INFORMAL BRIEF with Exhibits attatched on behalf of Appellant Mr. Russell Robinson. Service made to Counsel by Clerk's Office on 03/27/2024 via CM/ECF. (TMS) [Entered: 03/27/2024 05:06 PM]
March 1, 2024 Filing 12 Document filed by Appellant Mr. Russell Robinson titled status report advisng the Court of being barred from any further filing in the district court. (LMR) [Entered: 03/01/2024 03:26 PM]
February 29, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (LMR) [Entered: 02/29/2024 12:11 PM]
February 29, 2024 Filing 10 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Russell Robinson due on or before 04/09/2024. Appendix due on or before 04/09/2024. (LMR) [Entered: 02/29/2024 12:09 PM]
February 29, 2024 Filing 9 COPY OF ORDER OF DISTRICT COURT dated 02/21/2024 signed by Robert A. Molloy. (LMR) [Entered: 02/29/2024 12:05 PM]
February 29, 2024 Filing 8 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 02/29/2024. (LMR) [Entered: 02/29/2024 12:01 PM]
February 27, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: Docket Entry #5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ERROR: Document was meant to be docketed in the District Court. CORRECTION: Correct ENTRY OF APPEARANCE form was entered on the docket at Entry #6. Entry #5 document will be deleted. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. (AMR) [Entered: 02/27/2024 03:48 PM]
February 27, 2024 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Aysha R. Gregory, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America. [24-1277] (AG) [Entered: 02/27/2024 01:12 PM]
February 27, 2024 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Aysha R. Gregory, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America. [24-1277] (AG) [Entered: 02/27/2024 12:51 PM]
February 16, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK ORDER - RULE 4(a)(4) staying case pending disposition of post decision motion(s). (LMR) [Entered: 02/16/2024 08:46 AM]
February 14, 2024 Filing 3 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 02/14/2024 10:50 AM]
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (LMR) [Entered: 02/14/2024 10:49 AM]
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Russell Robinson in District Court No. 3-22-cv-00041. (LMR) [Entered: 02/14/2024 10:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. One 1962 Aero Twin Commander 500B, Tail No. N37CK,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kimberly L. Cole Esq.
Represented By: Aysha Gregory Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 1962 AERO TWIN COMMANDER 500B, TAIL NO. N37CK, SERIAL NO. 500A-1251-76
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: RUSSELL ROBINSON
Represented By: Russell Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?