USA v. Michael Rinaldi
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: MICHAEL RINALDI
Case Number: 24-1766
Filed: May 1, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Oth Forfeiture and Penalty Suits
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Mr. Michael Rinaldi The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order. (JK) [Entered: 06/21/2024 10:49 AM]
June 6, 2024 Filing 8 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Mr. Michael Rinaldi. (JK) [Entered: 06/10/2024 03:03 PM]
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Clerk) deferring motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Appellant must file a prison account statement that details account activity, to include all receipts, expenditures, and balances, for the most recent 6-month period prior to the filing of the notice of appeal. The prison account statement must be filed within 14 days of the date of this order. (KR) [Entered: 05/24/2024 11:06 AM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from AUSA Sean A. Camoni on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America. [24-1766] (SAC) [Entered: 05/22/2024 07:43 AM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 5 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Attorney Sean A. Camoni, Esq. for Appellee USA requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 06/04/2024. (JK) [Entered: 05/21/2024 05:51 PM]
May 16, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Michael Rinaldi to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (JK) [Entered: 05/20/2024 06:05 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK) [Entered: 05/01/2024 10:15 AM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 05/01/2024 10:15 AM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Michael Rinaldi in District Court No. 3-21-cv-00225. (JK) [Entered: 05/01/2024 10:09 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Michael Rinaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Sean A. Camoni Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL RINALDI
Represented By: Michael Rinaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?