Elmer Daniels v. City of Wilmington, et al
Plaintiff: ELMER DANIELS
Defendant: CITY OF WILMINGTON and PHILLIP A. SAGGIONE, Esq.
Case Number: 24-1808
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Court Reporter Michele Rolfe directing transcripts, ordered on 05/31/2024 , to be filed by 07/03/2024. (SB) [Entered: 05/31/2024 03:46 PM]
May 31, 2024 Filing 11 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Mr. Elmer Daniels. [24-1808] (EI) [Entered: 05/31/2024 03:23 PM]
May 31, 2024 Filing 10 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Mr. Elmer Daniels. [24-1808] (EI) [Entered: 05/31/2024 03:23 PM]
May 31, 2024 Filing 9 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Elmer Daniels on behalf of Appellant(s) Elmer Daniels. [24-1808] (EI) [Entered: 05/31/2024 03:22 PM]
May 31, 2024 Filing 8 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Mr. Elmer Daniels advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: January 25, 2024, to be filed by Michele Rolfe. [24-1808] (EI) [Entered: 05/31/2024 03:20 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel A. Griffith, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) City of Wilmington and Phillip A. Saggione. [24-1808] (DAG) [Entered: 05/20/2024 12:48 PM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Attorney Daniel A. Griffith, Esq. for Appellees City of Wilmington and Phillip A. Saggione, Esq. requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/31/2024. (SB) [Entered: 05/17/2024 01:01 PM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 5 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Theopalis K. Gregory, Esq. for Appellant Mr. Elmer Daniels and Emeka Igwe, Esq. for Appellant Mr. Elmer Daniels requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/31/2024. Information Statement on or before 05/31/2024. Concise Summary on or before 05/31/2024. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 05/31/2024. (SB) [Entered: 05/17/2024 12:54 PM]
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 Appendix Citation Notice sent to Theopalis K. Gregory, Esq., Emeka Igwe, Esq., Daniel A. Griffith, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 05/16/2024. (SB) [Entered: 05/02/2024 01:31 PM]
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (SB) [Entered: 05/02/2024 01:24 PM]
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 05/02/2024 01:17 PM]
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Elmer Daniels in District Court No. 1-20-cv-01692. (SB) [Entered: 05/02/2024 01:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Elmer Daniels v. City of Wilmington, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELMER DANIELS
Represented By: Theopalis K. Gregory Esq.
Represented By: Emeka Igwe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF WILMINGTON
Represented By: Daniel A. Griffith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP A. SAGGIONE, Esq.
Represented By: Daniel A. Griffith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?