Stony Battery RD Property Owner LLC, et al v. QVC Inc
Plaintiff: STONY BATTERY RD PROPERTY OWNER LLC and STONY CORP BLVD LLC
Defendant: QVC INC
Case Number: 24-2024
Filed: June 10, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Edward J. Sholinsky on behalf of Appellant(s) QVC, Inc.. [24-2024] (EJS) [Entered: 06/14/2024 09:14 AM]
June 13, 2024 Filing 5 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant QVC Inc advising this court that no transcripts are available. [24-2024] (EJS) [Entered: 06/13/2024 12:25 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 4 Appendix Citation Notice sent to Nathan Huddell, Esq., Brooke Hurlbrink, Esq., Edward J. Sholinsky, Esq., Jonathan Adam Ozarow, Esq., Janesa Urbano, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 06/25/2024. (KR) [Entered: 06/10/2024 02:57 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR) [Entered: 06/10/2024 02:56 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 06/10/2024 02:55 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant QVC Inc in District Court No. 5-23-cv-00518. (KR) [Entered: 06/10/2024 02:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Stony Battery RD Property Owner LLC, et al v. QVC Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STONY BATTERY RD PROPERTY OWNER LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Ozarow Esq.
Represented By: Janesa Urbano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STONY CORP BLVD LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Ozarow Esq.
Represented By: Janesa Urbano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QVC INC
Represented By: Nathan Huddell Esq.
Represented By: Brooke Hurlbrink Esq.
Represented By: Edward J. Sholinsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?