In re: Meijer Inc, et al v. Pfizer Inc, et al
Plaintiff: MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC and MEIJER INC
Defendant: WARNER LAMBERT CO LLC, RANBAXY INC, PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS, PFIZER INC, WARNER LAMBERT CO, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC and RANBAXY LABORATORIES LTD
Unknown: In re: LIPITOR ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 24-2184
Filed: July 8, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 [24-2184, 24-2185, 24-2189, 24-2194, 24-2202, 24-2203, 24-2256, 24-2257] (AMR) [Entered: 09/04/2024 12:55 PM]
September 4, 2024 Filing 28 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Meijer Distribution Inc, Meijer Inc, HEB Grocery Co LP, Safeway Inc, SuperValu Inc, The Kroger Co, Walgreen Co, Giant Eagle Inc, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Eckerd Corp, JCG (PJC) USA LLC, Maxi Drug Inc, Rite Aid Corp, Rite Aid Hdqtrs Corp, Drogueria Betances, Professional Drug Co Inc, Rochester Drug Cooperative Inc, Stephen L LaFrance Holdings Inc, Value Drug Co, AF of L AGC Building Trades Welfare Plan, Bakers Local 433 Health Fund, Nancy Billington, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31 Insurance Trust Fund, Emilie Heinle, Andrew Livezey, Louisiana Health Service Indemnity Co, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore and New Mexico United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Health and Welfare Trust Fund due on or before 10/15/2024. Appendix due on or before 10/15/2024. [24-2185, 24-2184, 24-2189, 24-2194, 24-2202, 24-2203, 24-2256, 24-2257] (AMR) [Entered: 09/04/2024 12:48 PM]
August 27, 2024 Filing 27 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Warner Lambert Co LLC. [24-2256] (RAM) [Entered: 08/27/2024 05:17 PM]
August 27, 2024 Filing 26 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals. [24-2256] (RAM) [Entered: 08/27/2024 05:13 PM]
August 27, 2024 Filing 25 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Pfizer Inc. [24-2256] (RSG) [Entered: 08/27/2024 03:22 PM]
August 27, 2024 Filing 24 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Raj Gandesha on behalf of Appellee(s) Pfizer Inc.; Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals; Warner-Lambert Co.; Warner-Lambert Company LLC. [24-2256] (RSG) [Entered: 08/27/2024 03:21 PM]
August 27, 2024 Filing 23 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert Milne on behalf of Appellee(s) Pfizer Inc.; Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals; Warner-Lambert Co.; Warner-Lambert Company LLC. [24-2256] (RAM) [Entered: 08/27/2024 03:12 PM]
August 23, 2024 Filing 22 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John P. Bjork on behalf of Appellant(s) Meijer Inc. and Meijer Distribution Inc.. [24-2184] (JPB) [Entered: 08/23/2024 04:55 PM]
August 13, 2024 Filing 21 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Dimitrios T. Drivas, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Jessica K. Formichella, Esq. for Appellees Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Michael J. Gallagher, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Liza M. Walsh, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Inc, Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, William T. Walsh, Jr., Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Inc, Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC and Brendan G. Woodard, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC in 24-2184, 24-2185, Dimitrios T. Drivas, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Jessica K. Formichella, Esq. for Appellees Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Michael J. Gallagher, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Liza M. Walsh, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Inc, Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, William T. Walsh, Jr., Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Inc, Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC and Brendan G. Woodard, Esq. for Appellee Warner Lambert Co LLC in 24-2189, Dimitrios T. Drivas, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Jessica K. Formichella, Esq. for Appellees Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals, Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Michael J. Gallagher, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Liza M. Walsh, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Inc, Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, William T. Walsh, Jr., Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Inc, Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC and Brendan G. Woodard, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC in 24-2194, 24-2202, 24-2203, 24-2256 requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/27/2024. [24-2184, 24-2185, 24-2189, 24-2194, 24-2202, 24-2203, 24-2256] (AMR) [Entered: 08/13/2024 02:33 PM]
August 1, 2024 Filing 20 CLERK (ORDER) The Retailer Plaintiffs and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs filed six appeals (Nos. 24-2184, 24-2185, 24-2189, 24-2194, 24-2202, & 24-2203) that were previously consolidated. Later, the End Payor Plaintiffs filed two appeals (Nos. 24-2256 & 24-2257), which were consolidated together for all purposes. They are now further consolidated with the Retailer Plaintiffs' and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' appeals so that all eight appeals are consolidated for purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix, the appellees' response brief, and disposition. The appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. The appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). The parties are hereby directed to electronically file documents on the Court's docket as follows: Appellants: All case opening forms, motions, and briefs must be filed only in the appeal number assigned to the filer's notice of appeal. If a document is being filed jointly by multiple appellants, the document must be filed in the appeal numbers assigned to the filing appellants. Appellees: All case opening forms must be filed in all appeals in which the appellee intends to participate. All motions should be filed only in those cases for which the relief is being requested. Appellee's consolidated brief must be filed in all appeals to which the appellee is responding. The consolidated joint appendix must be filed in all appeal numbers. The parties are advised that failure to file documents in the appropriate case may result in the issuance of a noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document. [24-2184, 24-2185, 24-2189, 24-2194, 24-2202, 24-2203, 24-2256] (AMR) [Entered: 08/01/2024 12:23 PM]
July 26, 2024 Filing 19 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Dimitrios T. Drivas, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Jessica K. Formichella, Esq. for Appellees Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Michael J. Gallagher, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, Liza M. Walsh, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Inc, Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC, William T. Walsh, Jr., Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Inc, Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC and Brendan G. Woodard, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC in 24-2184, Liza M. Walsh, Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Inc, Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC and William T. Walsh, Jr., Esq. for Appellees Pfizer Inc, Warner Lambert Co, Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals and Warner Lambert Co LLC in 24-2185 requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/09/2024. [24-2184, 24-2185, 24-2189, 24-2194, 24-2202, 24-2203] (AMR) [Entered: 07/26/2024 04:22 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 18 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc. [24-2184] (DWA) [Entered: 07/22/2024 05:48 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 17 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd. [24-2184] (DWA) [Entered: 07/22/2024 05:47 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 16 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Ranbaxy Inc. [24-2184] (DWA) [Entered: 07/22/2024 05:46 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 15 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gilad Bendheim on behalf of Appellee(s) Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd.. [24-2184] (GYB) [Entered: 07/22/2024 04:33 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 14 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexandra I. Russell on behalf of Appellee(s) Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd.. [24-2184] (AIR) [Entered: 07/22/2024 04:22 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 13 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Devora W. Allon on behalf of Appellee(s) Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd.. [24-2184] (DWA) [Entered: 07/22/2024 04:07 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 12 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jay P. Lefkowitz on behalf of Appellee(s) Ranbaxy Inc., Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd.. [24-2184] (JPL) [Entered: 07/22/2024 03:42 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 11 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David P. Germaine on behalf of Appellant(s) Meijer Inc. and Meijer Distribution Inc.. [24-2184] (JMV) [Entered: 07/22/2024 03:34 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 10 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joseph M Vanek on behalf of Appellant(s) Meijer Inc. and Meijer Distribution Inc.. [24-2184] (JMV) [Entered: 07/22/2024 03:32 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 9 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Meijer Distribution Inc and Meijer Inc advising this court that. [24-2184] (JMV) [Entered: 07/22/2024 03:13 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 8 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Meijer Distribution Inc and Meijer Inc. [24-2184] (JMV) [Entered: 07/22/2024 03:11 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 7 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Meijer Distribution Inc and Meijer Inc. [24-2184] (JMV) [Entered: 07/22/2024 03:03 PM]
July 22, 2024 Filing 6 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Meijer Distribution Inc and Meijer Inc. [24-2184] (JMV) [Entered: 07/22/2024 02:54 PM]
July 8, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK ORDER: The above-captioned appeals are all consolidated for purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix, the appellees' response brief, and disposition. The appeals at Nos. 24-2202 and 24-2203 are further consolidated for all purposes. The appellants are encouraged to consult with one another regarding the contents of their briefs as the Court disfavors repetitive briefs. The appellants may file a consolidated brief or join in or adopt portions by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). The parties are hereby directed to electronically file documents on the Court's docket as follows: Appellants: All case opening forms, motions, and briefs must be filed only in the appeal number assigned to the filer's notice of appeal. If a document is being filed jointly by multiple appellants, the document must be filed in the appeal numbers assigned to the filing appellants. Appellees: All case opening forms must be filed in all appeals in which the appellee intends to participate. All motions should be filed only in those cases for which the relief is being requested. Appellee's consolidated brief must be filed in all appeals to which the appellee is responding. The consolidated joint appendix must be filed in all appeal numbers. The parties are advised that case opening forms for later filed appeals must only be filed in the new appeals and not re-filed in earlier appeals in which the forms were previously filed. The parties are further advised that failure to file documents in the appropriate case may result in the issuance of a noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document. [24-2184, 24-2185, 24-2189, 24-2194, 24-2202, 24-2203] (AMR) [Entered: 07/08/2024 05:03 PM]
July 8, 2024 Filing 4 Certified copy of DUPLICATE notice of appeal filed in the district court on 07/01/2024 received from Clerk of District Court. (AMR) [Entered: 07/08/2024 12:55 PM]
July 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (AMR) [Entered: 07/08/2024 12:38 PM]
July 8, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 07/08/2024 12:37 PM]
July 8, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Meijer Distribution Inc and Meijer Inc in District Court No. 3-12-cv-02389,3-12-cv-04537. (AMR) [Entered: 07/08/2024 12:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Meijer Inc, et al v. Pfizer Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER LAMBERT CO LLC
Represented By: Brendan G. Woodard Esq.
Represented By: William T. Walsh Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Liza M. Walsh Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Gallagher Esq.
Represented By: Jessica K. Formichella Esq.
Represented By: Dimitrios T. Drivas Esq.
Represented By: Robert A. Milne Esq.
Represented By: Raj S. Gandesha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANBAXY INC
Represented By: Jeffrey Soos Esq.
Represented By: Katherine A. Escanlar Esq.
Represented By: Arnold B. Calmann Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra I. Russell Esq.
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz Esq.
Represented By: Gilad Y. Bendheim Esq.
Represented By: Devora W. Allon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER IRELAND PHARMACEUTICALS
Represented By: Brendan G. Woodard Esq.
Represented By: William T. Walsh Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Liza M. Walsh Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Gallagher Esq.
Represented By: Jessica K. Formichella Esq.
Represented By: Dimitrios T. Drivas Esq.
Represented By: Robert A. Milne Esq.
Represented By: Raj S. Gandesha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC
Represented By: William T. Walsh Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Liza M. Walsh Esq.
Represented By: Robert A. Milne Esq.
Represented By: Raj S. Gandesha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER LAMBERT CO
Represented By: William T. Walsh Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Liza M. Walsh Esq.
Represented By: Jessica K. Formichella Esq.
Represented By: Robert A. Milne Esq.
Represented By: Raj S. Gandesha Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: Jeffrey Soos Esq.
Represented By: Katherine A. Escanlar Esq.
Represented By: Arnold B. Calmann Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra I. Russell Esq.
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz Esq.
Represented By: Gilad Y. Bendheim Esq.
Represented By: Devora W. Allon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANBAXY LABORATORIES LTD
Represented By: Jeffrey Soos Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra I. Russell Esq.
Represented By: Jay P. Lefkowitz Esq.
Represented By: Katherine A. Escanlar Esq.
Represented By: Arnold B. Calmann Esq.
Represented By: Gilad Y. Bendheim Esq.
Represented By: Devora W. Allon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEIJER DISTRIBUTION INC
Represented By: Joseph M. Vanek Esq.
Represented By: David P. Germaine Esq.
Represented By: Deborah S. Corbishley Esq.
Represented By: John P. Bjork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEIJER INC
Represented By: Joseph M. Vanek Esq.
Represented By: David P. Germaine Esq.
Represented By: Deborah S. Corbishley Esq.
Represented By: John P. Bjork Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: In re: LIPITOR ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Represented By: Chad B. Holtzman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?