Board of Trustees Plumbers and Pipefitters Local U, et al v. Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 SCHOLARSHIP FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 EDUCATIONAL PAC FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 APPRENTICESHIP FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 WELFARE FUND, UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA LOCAL 74, BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 PENSION FUND and BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 ANNUITY FUND
Defendant: JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS INC
Case Number: 24-2291
Filed: July 19, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: ERISA Employ Retire Income Sec Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion is granted. Appellants brief and appendix must be filed and served on or before October 7, 2024. [23-2202, 24-2291] (LMR) [Entered: 09/13/2024 10:39 AM]
September 9, 2024 Filing 15 ECF FILER: Unopposed Motion filed by Appellant Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Brief until/for 21-days or October 7, 2024. Certificate of Service dated 09/09/2024. Service made by ECF. [23-2202, 24-2291] (EAK) [Entered: 09/09/2024 02:27 PM]
August 5, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 [23-2202, 24-2291] (LMR) [Entered: 08/05/2024 04:48 PM]
August 5, 2024 Filing 13 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc due on or before 09/16/2024. Appendix due on or before 09/16/2024. [23-2202, 24-2291] (LMR) [Entered: 08/05/2024 04:47 PM]
August 2, 2024 Filing 12 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc. [24-2291] (EAK) [Entered: 08/02/2024 01:06 PM]
August 1, 2024 Filing 11 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT [24-2291, 23-2202] (WDF) [Entered: 08/01/2024 02:04 PM]
July 30, 2024 Filing 10 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from W. Daniel Feehan, Esq. HOLROYD GELMAN, P.C. on behalf of Appellee(s) L.U. No. 74 United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the U.S. and Canada; Trustees of Local Union No. 74 Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, Welfare Fund, Scholarship Fund, Apprenticeship Fund, Ed. and PAC Fund. [24-2291, 23-2202] (WDF) [Entered: 07/30/2024 02:42 PM]
July 23, 2024 Filing 9 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc. [24-2291] (EAK) [Entered: 07/23/2024 11:13 AM]
July 23, 2024 Filing 8 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [24-2291] (EAK) [Entered: 07/23/2024 11:09 AM]
July 23, 2024 Filing 7 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc. [24-2291] (EAK) [Entered: 07/23/2024 11:06 AM]
July 23, 2024 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Emily A. Kile-Maxwell on behalf of Appellant(s) Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. [24-2291] (EAK) [Entered: 07/23/2024 11:03 AM]
July 23, 2024 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brian J. Paul on behalf of Appellant(s) Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. [24-2291] (BP) [Entered: 07/23/2024 10:59 AM]
July 19, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK ORDER The actions at Nos. 23-2202 and 24-2291 are hereby consolidated for all purposes. Appeal No. 23-2202 will not be listed for dismissal at this time. All responses filed by the parties regarding the jurisdictional issue are referred to the merits panel. This does not in any way signify that a determination of jurisdiction has been made. Only the Court can make such a decision. The parties are directed to address this Courts jurisdiction in their briefs. [Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order] [23-2202, 24-2291] (LMR) [Entered: 07/19/2024 12:17 PM]
July 19, 2024 Filing 3 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 07/19/2024 12:04 PM]
July 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (LMR) [Entered: 07/19/2024 12:02 PM]
July 19, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc in District Court No. 1-20-cv-00194. (LMR) [Entered: 07/19/2024 11:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Board of Trustees Plumbers and Pipefitters Local U, et al v. Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Kinkus Esq.
Represented By: W. Daniel Feehan Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 EDUCATIONAL PAC FUND
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Kinkus Esq.
Represented By: W. Daniel Feehan Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 APPRENTICESHIP FUND
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Kinkus Esq.
Represented By: W. Daniel Feehan Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Kinkus Esq.
Represented By: W. Daniel Feehan Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA LOCAL 74
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Kinkus Esq.
Represented By: W. Daniel Feehan Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 PENSION FUND
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Kinkus Esq.
Represented By: W. Daniel Feehan Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO 74 ANNUITY FUND
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Kinkus Esq.
Represented By: W. Daniel Feehan Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS INC
Represented By: Gregory J. Ossi Esq.
Represented By: Emily A. Kile-Maxwell Esq.
Represented By: Brian Paul Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?