Perry Beeney, et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Plaintiff: PERRY BEENEY
Defendant: STELLANTIS NV and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 24-2519
Filed: August 21, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2024 Filing 15 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Samantha Braver on behalf of Appellant(s) Perry Beeney, Wendy Beeney, Nathan Benefield, John Bucalo, Daniel Childs, Trevor Cole, Robert Collingwood, Scott Cook, Gary Dutkowski, Billy E. Rowles Jr., Darell Upshaw, & Jeff Vance (all plaintiffs), on behalf of themselves & all others similarly.... [24-2519] (SIB) [Entered: 10/15/2024 03:38 PM]
September 10, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (SB) [Entered: 09/10/2024 09:50 AM]
September 10, 2024 Filing 13 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Perry Beeney, et al., due on or before 10/21/2024. Appendix due on or before 10/21/2024. (SB) [Entered: 09/10/2024 09:45 AM]
September 9, 2024 Filing 12 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Perry Beeney advising this court that no transcripts are available. [24-2519] (SDB) [Entered: 09/09/2024 04:18 PM]
September 9, 2024 Filing 11 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sara Delaney Brooks on behalf of Appellant(s) Perry Beeney, Wendy Beeney, Nathan Benefield, John Bucalo, Daniel Childs, Trevor Cole, Robert Collingwood, Scott Cook, Gary Dutkowski, Billy E. Rowles Jr., Darell Upshaw, and Jeff Vance (all plaintiffs). [24-2519] (SDB) [Entered: 09/09/2024 02:18 PM]
September 5, 2024 Filing 10 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Ian C. Bifferato, Esq. for Appellant Perry Beeney, Brian E. Farnan, Esq. for Appellant Perry Beeney, Michael J. Farnan, Esq. for Appellant Perry Beeney, Jon M. Herskowitz, Esq. for Appellant Perry Beeney, Spencer S. Hughes, Esq. for Appellant Perry Beeney and David Stein, Esq. for Appellant Perry Beeney requesting the following document(s): Transcript Purchase Order on or before 09/19/2024. (SB) [Entered: 09/05/2024 12:15 PM]
September 3, 2024 Filing 9 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee FCA US LLC. [24-2519] (SAD) [Entered: 09/03/2024 03:45 PM]
September 3, 2024 Filing 8 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen A. D'Aunoy on behalf of Appellee(s) FCA US LLC. [24-2519] (SAD) [Entered: 09/03/2024 03:43 PM]
September 3, 2024 Filing 7 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Perry Beeney. [24-2519] (SSH) [Entered: 09/03/2024 02:55 PM]
September 3, 2024 Filing 6 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Perry Beeney. [24-2519] (SSH) [Entered: 09/03/2024 02:54 PM]
August 26, 2024 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Spencer Hughes on behalf of Appellant(s) Perry Beeney, Wendy Beeney, Nathan Benefield, John Bucalo, Daniel Childs, Trevor Cole, Robert Collingwood, Scott Cook, Gary Dutkowski, Billy E. Rowles Jr., Darell Upshaw, and Jeff Vance (all plaintiffs). [24-2519] (SSH) [Entered: 08/26/2024 02:54 PM]
August 26, 2024 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David Stein on behalf of Appellant(s) Perry Beeney, Wendy Beeney, Nathan Benefield, John Bucalo, Daniel Childs, Trevor Cole, Robert Collingwood, Scott Cook, Gary Dutkowski, Billy E. Rowles Jr., Darell Upshaw, and Jeff Vance (all plaintiffs). [24-2519] (DS) [Entered: 08/26/2024 02:50 PM]
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Clerk)To facilitate electronic filing for larger groups of parties represented by the same attorney, the first named party in each group will be the designated filer, as follows: For all parties represented by Michael J. Farnan, Esq., or any other attorney from Farnan LLP, the designated filer shall be Perry Beeney. Counsel is advised that the designated filer is for cm/ecf filing purposes only. Names of all represented parties must be listed on all forms, motions, and briefs. Attorneys representing smaller groups of parties must select all individual persons or entities as filers in cm/ecf. (SB) [Entered: 08/21/2024 09:47 AM]
August 21, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 08/21/2024 09:42 AM]
August 21, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Perry Beeney in District Court No. 1-22-cv-00518. (SB) [Entered: 08/21/2024 09:36 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Perry Beeney, et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERRY BEENEY
Represented By: David Stein Esq.
Represented By: Spencer S. Hughes Esq.
Represented By: Jon M. Herskowitz Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan Esq.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan Esq.
Represented By: Sara D. Brooks Esq.
Represented By: Ian C. Bifferato Esq.
Represented By: Samantha I. Braver Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STELLANTIS NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Jessica L. Reno Esq.
Represented By: Stephen A. D'Aunoy Esq.
Represented By: Patrick M. Brannigan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?