Leroy Garrett v. Petroleos de Venezuela, et al
Plaintiff: LEROY A. GARRETT
Defendant: PDV HOLDING and PETROLEOS DE VENEZUELA
Case Number: 24-2791
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (Clerk) referring to the merits panel the motion to dismiss in part for lack of apppellate jurisdiction filed by Appellee PDV Holding and any responses. (KR) [Entered: 11/22/2024 11:16 AM]
November 8, 2024 Filing 10 ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee PDV Holding to dismiss in part for lack of apppellate jurisdiction . Certificate of Service dated 11/08/2024. Service made by US mail, ECF. [24-2791]--[Edited 11/18/2024 by PDB] SEND TO THE MERITS PANEL.--[Edited 11/25/2024 by PDB] (NPE) [Entered: 11/08/2024 08:01 PM]
October 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR) [Entered: 10/16/2024 01:25 PM]
October 16, 2024 Filing 8 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Leroy A. Garrett due on or before 11/25/2024. Appendix due on or before 11/25/2024. (KR) [Entered: 10/16/2024 01:23 PM]
October 16, 2024 Filing 7 Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 10/16/2024. (KR) [Entered: 10/16/2024 01:20 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 6 ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee PDV Holding. [24-2791] (NPE) [Entered: 10/11/2024 04:44 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel D. Birk on behalf of Appellee(s) PDV Holding, Inc.. [24-2791] (DDB) [Entered: 10/11/2024 04:38 PM]
October 11, 2024 Filing 4 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nathan P. Eimer on behalf of Appellee(s) PDV Holding, Inc.. [24-2791] (NPE) [Entered: 10/11/2024 04:34 PM]
September 27, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (KR) [Entered: 09/27/2024 02:22 PM]
September 27, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 09/27/2024 02:22 PM]
September 27, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Leroy A. Garrett in District Court No. 1-24-cv-00380. (KR) [Entered: 09/27/2024 02:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Leroy Garrett v. Petroleos de Venezuela, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDV HOLDING
Represented By: Susan W. Waesco Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar Esq.
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Cumings Esq.
Represented By: Daniel D. Birk Esq.
Represented By: Kirk Andersen Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETROLEOS DE VENEZUELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEROY A. GARRETT
Represented By: Leroy A. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?