Margarita Marshall v. United States Post Office, et al
Plaintiff: MARGARITA MARSHALL
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POST OFFICE and UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE NATIONAL TORT CENTER
Case Number: 24-3104
Filed: November 8, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2025 Filing 15 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Margarita Marshall. Certificate of service dated 01/06/2025 by ECF. [24-3104] (RST) [Entered: 01/06/2025 02:47 PM]
January 6, 2025 Filing 14 ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Margarita Marshall. Certificate of Service dated 01/06/2025 by ECF. [24-3104] (RST) [Entered: 01/06/2025 02:43 PM]
December 4, 2024 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER (Clerk) granting Letter Motion to be Excused from Pilot Program for Appendix Citation Hyperlinking filed by Robert S. Tintner, Esq. on behalf of Appellant Margarita Marshall. Should counsel receive notice to participate in the program in future cases, counsel must notify the Court within the specified time frame if he elects to opt out or he will be required to comply. (DW) [Entered: 12/04/2024 11:19 AM]
December 3, 2024 Filing 12 ECF FILER: LETTER MOTION from Attorney Robert S. Tintner, Esq. for Appellant Margarita Marshall to be excused from Pilot Program for Appendix Citation Hyperlinking. Certificate of Service dated 12/03/2024. Service made by ECF. [24-3104]--[Edited 12/03/2024 by PDB] (RST) [Entered: 12/03/2024 02:24 PM]
November 27, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (PDB) [Entered: 11/27/2024 10:23 AM]
November 27, 2024 Filing 10 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Margarita Marshall due on or before 01/06/2025. Appendix due on or before 01/06/2025. (PDB) [Entered: 11/27/2024 10:20 AM]
November 21, 2024 Filing 9 ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Margarita Marshall. [24-3104] (RST) [Entered: 11/21/2024 04:51 PM]
November 21, 2024 Filing 8 ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Margarita Marshall. [24-3104] (RST) [Entered: 11/21/2024 11:43 AM]
November 21, 2024 Filing 7 ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Margarita Marshall advising this court that no transcripts are available. [24-3104] (RST) [Entered: 11/21/2024 11:39 AM]
November 15, 2024 Filing 6 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mansi G. Shah on behalf of Appellee(s) UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; UNITED STATES POST OFFICE; UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE NATIONAL TORT CENTER. [24-3104] (MS) [Entered: 11/15/2024 09:40 AM]
November 13, 2024 Filing 5 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert S. Tintner, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Margarita Marshall. [24-3104] (RST) [Entered: 11/13/2024 03:18 PM]
November 8, 2024 Filing 4 Appendix Citation Notice sent to Adam E. Grutzmacher, Esq., Mansi Shah, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 11/25/2024. (PDB) [Entered: 11/08/2024 04:57 PM]
November 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (PDB) [Entered: 11/08/2024 04:56 PM]
November 8, 2024 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 11/08/2024 04:56 PM]
November 8, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Margarita Marshall in District Court No. 2:24-cv-01931. (PDB) [Entered: 11/08/2024 04:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Margarita Marshall v. United States Post Office, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mansi Shah Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POST OFFICE
Represented By: Mansi Shah Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE NATIONAL TORT CENTER
Represented By: Mansi Shah Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARITA MARSHALL
Represented By: Adam E. Grutzmacher Esq.
Represented By: Robert S. Tintner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?